Gelbard et al v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Michael Sternfeld, Luke Hanna, Tim Young and Edo Gelbard
Defendant: City of New York, John and Jane Does, Mayor Bill de Blasio, NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea and NYPD Chief of Dept Terence Monahan
Case Number: 1:2020cv03163
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Sternfeld, Luke Hanna, Edo Gelbard, Tim Young. Terence Monahan waiver sent on 8/4/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Lieb, Douglas)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by City of New York. (Reilly, Kathleen)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for All Defendants Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by 11/4/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/4/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City of New York, Terence Monahan, Dermot Shea, Bill de Blasio. (Attachments: #1 Shea summons, #2 Monahan summons, #3 de Blasio summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Edward Lieb on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Lieb, Douglas)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Edo Gelbard, Luke Hanna, Michael Sternfeld, Tim Young (Lebowitz, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Edo Gelbard, Luke Hanna, Michael Sternfeld, Tim Young (Lebowitz, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Edo Gelbard, Luke Hanna, Michael Sternfeld, Tim Young (Lebowitz, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Edo Gelbard, Luke Hanna, Michael Sternfeld, Tim Young (Lebowitz, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, John and Jane Does, Terence Monahan, Dermot Shea, Bill de Blasio filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13069830 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Michael Sternfeld, Luke Hanna, Edo Gelbard, Tim Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lebowitz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gelbard et al v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Kathleen Deborah Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill de Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Chief of Dept Terence Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sternfeld
Represented By: Douglas Edward Lieb
Represented By: David A. Lebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Hanna
Represented By: Douglas Edward Lieb
Represented By: David A. Lebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Young
Represented By: Douglas Edward Lieb
Represented By: David A. Lebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edo Gelbard
Represented By: Douglas Edward Lieb
Represented By: David A. Lebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?