Estate of Yvette Anglade et al v. American Airlines Group Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Lesly Michel and Estate of Yvette Anglade
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc.,, Jetblue Airways Corporation., and International Airlines Group, S.A.,
Case Number: 1:2020cv03226
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Estate of Yvette Anglade, Lesly Michel (Davis, Kimberly)
July 27, 2020 ***FINAL NOTICE:*** Re: The Clerks Office is awaiting the completed Civil Cover Sheet so that this case may be processed. If in 30 days of the filing date (7/18/2020), we do not receive the completed form, this case will be administratively closed. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 22, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a completed Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Estate of Yvette Anglade, Lesly Michel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Bruno, Jean-Phlippe)
July 20, 2020 Your proposed summons will not be issued for one of the following reasons: Did not use the correct Summons form AO 440 Rev 6/12, SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION or AO 441 Rev 7/10, SUMMONS ON A THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 20, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a completed Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 1:20-cv-03226 against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13083932 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Yvette Anglade Estate of, Lesly Michel. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS) (Bruno, Jean-Phlippe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Yvette Anglade et al v. American Airlines Group Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetblue Airways Corporation.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Airlines Group, S.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesly Michel
Represented By: Jean-Phlippe Gallieni Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Yvette Anglade
Represented By: Jean-Phlippe Gallieni Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?