Siracusa et al v. Zantac (Ranutidine) Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Frank Siracusa and Romana Siracusa
Defendant: Zantac (Ranutidine) Products Liability Litigation, OptumRx, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer, COSTCO Wholesale Corporation, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03315
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 CASE: 1:20-cv-03315 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Southern District of Florida as case 9:20-cv-81356, filed 08/20/2020. (Marziliano, August)
August 19, 2020 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Florida. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-30 - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of February 6, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (Marziliano, August)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-30 - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of February 6, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. (Marziliano, August)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Frank Siracusa Conditional transfer order (Georgiou, Kristina)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Frank Siracusa tag along (Georgiou, Kristina)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER. Within 14 days, plaintiff shall notify the MDL panel that this is a tag-along case to the Zantac MDL litigation and request transfer to the MDL court (and file a copy of such notice and request in this Court), or show cause to this Court why such notice and request is not appropriate. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/29/2020. (Clarke, Melonie)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Frank Siracusa, Romana Siracusa (Georgiou, Kristina)
July 29, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Frank Siracusa, Romana Siracusa (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Georgiou, Kristina)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pfizer, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., COSTCO Wholesale Corporation, OptumRx, Inc., filed by Frank Siracusa, Romana Siracusa. (Georgiou, Kristina)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Frank Siracusa, Romana Siracusa (Georgiou, Kristina)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zantac (Ranutidine) Products Liability Litigation filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13119106 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Frank Siracusa, Romana Siracusa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Short form complaint) (Georgiou, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siracusa et al v. Zantac (Ranutidine) Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Siracusa
Represented By: Kristina Marie Georgiou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romana Siracusa
Represented By: Kristina Marie Georgiou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zantac (Ranutidine) Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COSTCO Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?