Valentine v. Maersk Line, Limited
Plaintiff: Robert, a/k/a Roberto Valentine, Robert Valentine and Roberto Valentine
Defendant: Maersk Line, Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv03322
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (Ramesar, Thameera)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Valentine without prejudice (Buchsbaum, Andrew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Maersk Line, Limited, Attention General Counsel, One Commerical Pl., 20th Floor, Norfolk, VA 23510-2103 on 07/24/20 by Robert Valentine. Waiver of Service due by 8/24/2020. (Buchsbaum, Andrew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Maersk Line, Limited. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maersk Line, Limited Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Robert, a/k/a Roberto Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons vs Maersk Line, Limited, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Buchsbaum, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine v. Maersk Line, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maersk Line, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert, a/k/a Roberto Valentine
Represented By: Andrew V. Buchsbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Valentine
Represented By: Andrew V. Buchsbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Valentine
Represented By: Andrew V. Buchsbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?