Patel v. Air India Limited
Plaintiff: Sahil Patel
Defendant: Air India Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv03332
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Air India Limited. (Maggio, John)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air India Limited (Maggio, John)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial/telephone conference will be held at 2:00 PM on 10/16/2020 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the 2:00 PM conference. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time Defendant makes an appearance with in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 10/16/2020. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/3/2020. (Manson, Eddie)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sahil Patel. Air India Limited waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Zeitzoff, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Arthur Zeitzoff on behalf of Sahil Patel (aty to be noticed) (Zeitzoff, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Air India Limited. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Air India Limited filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13111369 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Sahil Patel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bohrer, Abram)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. Air India Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sahil Patel
Represented By: Abram I. Bohrer
Represented By: David Arthur Zeitzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air India Limited
Represented By: John Maggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?