Escapa et al v. Iberia Lineas Aereas De Espana, S.A.
Plaintiff: Raxon Medina and Cristina Luz Escapa
Defendant: Iberia Lineas Aereas De Espana, S.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03502
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cristina Luz Escapa, Raxon Medina. Iberia Lineas Aereas De Espana, S.A. waiver sent on 8/4/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Applebaum, Erin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin R. Applebaum on behalf of Cristina Luz Escapa, Raxon Medina (notification declined or already on case) (Applebaum, Erin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information., by Cristina Luz Escapa, Raxon Medina (Applebaum, Erin)
August 5, 2020 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filled out correctly - specifically on page 2 the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2)section of the document. Question 1 indicates YES, however, this is not a removal from NYS Court located in Suffolk or Nassau County. Counsel is directed to correct Civil Cover Sheet and resubmit. Please check one box for each question. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Iberia Lineas Aereas De Espana, S.A. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13159684 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Cristina Luz Escapa, Raxon Medina. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Applebaum, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escapa et al v. Iberia Lineas Aereas De Espana, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raxon Medina
Represented By: Erin R. Applebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Luz Escapa
Represented By: Erin R. Applebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberia Lineas Aereas De Espana, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?