Caul v. Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aishaya Caul
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc. and Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03534
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to answer #12 is granted. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 10/15/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/14/2020. (Ferrara, Anthony)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.. (Benson, Craig)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin K. Yam on behalf of Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Yam, Kevin)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul R Piccigallo on behalf of Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Piccigallo, Paul)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Benson on behalf of Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Benson, Craig)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Petco Store summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Aishaya Caul (Schaffer, Brian)
August 6, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a completed (Second Page Needs to Be Completed) Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter G Benharris on behalf of Aishaya Caul (aty to be noticed) (Benharris, Hunter)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Aishaya Caul (Schaffer, Brian)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Aishaya Caul (Schaffer, Brian)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13167720 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Aishaya Caul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Caul Paystub, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schaffer, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caul v. Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Paul R Piccigallo
Represented By: Kevin K. Yam
Represented By: Craig R. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.
Represented By: Paul R Piccigallo
Represented By: Kevin K. Yam
Represented By: Craig R. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aishaya Caul
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Represented By: Hunter G Benharris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?