Weberman v. Collado
Petitioner: Nechemya Weberman
Respondent: Superintendent Jaifa Collado
Case Number: 1:2020cv03584
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 Letter to USDJ Cogan correcting summary of respondent's Exhs. N-R by Jaifa Collado (Bruffee, Anthea)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 Letter to USDCJ Cogan enclosing appellate briefs and appendices by Jaifa Collado (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Bruffee, Anthea)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 . The Court finds that the privacy interests of the child outweigh the qualified interest of the public in full disclosure. The Court expects that the record will be permeated with such references and that redaction is therefore not practical. However, the District Attorney is directed to review the record prior to filing and if there are portions that can be publicly filed without compromising the privacy interests of the child, those portions should be publicly filed. The Court will also review the record and determine whether to unseal any additional portions of the record when it is filed. In addition, a hard copy of the record shall be delivered to Chambers when reasonably possible in light of the public health crisis. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/11/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Jaifa Collado. (Bruffee, Anthea)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nechemya Weberman. Attorney NEW YORK STATE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE - GENERIC,KINGS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE - GENERIC for Jaifa Collado added. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/9/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Nechemya Weberman /Court of Appeals Order Denying Leave (Aldea, Donna)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER. Petitioner is directed to advise this Court of the Court of Appeals' decision on the pending leave application within 30 days of that decision. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/10/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 10, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Nechemya Weberman (Aldea, Donna)
August 10, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit completed 2 page Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filing fee $ 5, receipt number ANYEDC-13185880, filed by Nechemya Weberman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Coram Nobis Decision AD, #2 Exhibit B - 440 Decision - Sup Ct, #3 Exhibit C - 440 Appeal Decision - AD, #4 Affidavit of Service) (Aldea, Donna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weberman v. Collado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nechemya Weberman
Represented By: Donna Aldea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent Jaifa Collado
Represented By: KINGS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE - GENERIC
Represented By: NEW YORK STATE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE - GENERIC
Represented By: Anthea Hemery Bruffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?