Cameron v. Cardiff Bay Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kesha Cameron
Defendant: Elena Zaretsky, Alex Solovey, Cardiff Bay Center, LLC d/b/a Peninsula Nursing and Rehabilitation Center and Michael Schrieber
Case Number: 1:2020cv03758
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Pamela K Chen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial/telephone conference will be held on 12/18/2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the 2:00 PM conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 12/18/2020. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/13/2020. (Manson, Eddie)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for an extension of time to Answer #9 is granted. Defendants shall file an Answer by 11/6/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/9/2020. (Farrell, Gillian)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kesha Cameron. Michael Schrieber served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (Baluzy, Christopher)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kesha Cameron. Elena Zaretsky served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (Baluzy, Christopher)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kesha Cameron. Alex Solovey served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (Baluzy, Christopher)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Cardiff Bay Center, LLC, Michael Schrieber, Alex Solovey, Elena Zaretsky. (Brecher, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W. Brecher on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Brecher, Jeffrey)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cardiff Bay Center, LLC, Michael Schrieber, Alex Solovey, Elena Zaretsky.(Attachments: #1 Solovey, #2 Zaretsky, #3 Schrieber). (Layne, Monique) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/29/2020) (Layne, Monique).
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint, by Kesha Cameron (Attachments: #1 Alex Solovey, #2 Michael Schrieber, #3 Elena Zaretsky) (Baluzy, Christopher)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Kesha Cameron (Baluzy, Christopher)
August 18, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Kesha Cameron (Baluzy, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cardiff Bay Center, LLC, Michael Schrieber, Alex Solovey, Elena Zaretsky filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13225036 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Kesha Cameron. (Baluzy, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron v. Cardiff Bay Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elena Zaretsky
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Brecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Solovey
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Brecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardiff Bay Center, LLC d/b/a Peninsula Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Brecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schrieber
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Brecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kesha Cameron
Represented By: Christopher S Baluzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?