Kritsky v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Alexander Kritsky
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv03772
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank D. Tankard on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Tankard, Frank)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 8/26/2020. (Herrera, Isaiah)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff filed the complaint on 08-17-2020. The parties are directed to adhere to the following procedure, which the Eastern District of New York Board of Judges has adopted for expediting the disposition of Social Security cases (See ATTACHED Order for further details). Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 08-26-2020.(Chan, Tsz)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexander Kritsky. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Alexander Kritsky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kritsky v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Frank D. Tankard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Kritsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?