Dazzling Courture LLC et al v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Plaintiff: LUX 18 LLC and Dazzling Courture LLC
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03802
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Marie Maletta on behalf of Dazzling Courture LLC, LUX 18 LLC (aty to be noticed) (Maletta, Laura)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf for all further proceedings. Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 8/31/2020. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Welch, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13236891) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Welch, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dazzling Courture LLC et al v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael P. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUX 18 LLC
Represented By: Laura Marie Maletta
Represented By: Johnathan C. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dazzling Courture LLC
Represented By: Laura Marie Maletta
Represented By: Johnathan C. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?