American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. MTB AMG INC. et al
Plaintiff: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Defendant: PAL Contracting Inc., MTB AMG INC., PAL AMG INC., MTB Contracting Inc. and MTB Metal Fabricators Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03929
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Klein on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Klein, Scott)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for All Defendants Extension of Time to Answer, respond or otherwise move in response to the Complaint by 11/16/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/13/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, On consent by MTB AMG INC., MTB Contracting Inc., MTB Metal Fabricators Inc., PAL AMG INC., PAL Contracting Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation) (Lawler, Ryan)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan William Lawler on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Lawler, Ryan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. PAL Contracting Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (O'Connor, Maureen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. MTB Metal Fabricators Inc. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (O'Connor, Maureen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. MTB Contracting Inc. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (O'Connor, Maureen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. PAL AMG INC. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (O'Connor, Maureen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. MTB AMG INC. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (O'Connor, Maureen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 PAL Contracting summons, #2 MTB Metal summons, #3 MTB Contracting summons, #4 PAL AMG summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet.. by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company (O'Connor, Maureen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company (O'Connor, Maureen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company (O'Connor, Maureen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company (O'Connor, Maureen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company (O'Connor, Maureen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company (O'Connor, Maureen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MTB AMG INC., MTB Contracting Inc., MTB Metal Fabricators Inc., PAL AMG INC., PAL Contracting Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13264217 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (O'Connor, Maureen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. MTB AMG INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAL Contracting Inc.
Represented By: Ryan William Lawler
Represented By: Scott A. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTB AMG INC.
Represented By: Ryan William Lawler
Represented By: Scott A. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAL AMG INC.
Represented By: Ryan William Lawler
Represented By: Scott A. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTB Contracting Inc.
Represented By: Ryan William Lawler
Represented By: Scott A. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTB Metal Fabricators Inc.
Represented By: Ryan William Lawler
Represented By: Scott A. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Maureen E. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?