Sokolovsky v. Oorah, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dorina Sokolovsky
Defendant: Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Gittie Sheinkopf, The Zone and Oorah, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Batsheva Kohn and Marvin Kohn
Case Number: 1:2020cv04116
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
2 Judge: James Orenstein
3 Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #51 : Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/27/2021. (Henney, Scott)
October 26, 2021 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brianna M. Espeland Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14970115. by Dorina Sokolovsky. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Certificate of Service) (Espeland, Brianna)
September 24, 2021 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #50 : Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery/Motion to Adjourn Conference. Discovery due by 10/27/2021. Status Conference originally set for 10/14/2021 is adjourned to 11/2/2021 at 3:15PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 3:15PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-4116. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/24/2021. (Henney, Scott)
September 23, 2021 Filing 50 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. (Varriale-Barker, Carla)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: On September 20, 2021, defendants Oorah, Inc. and Oorah Catskill Retreat LLC a/k/a The Zone (defendants) filed a letter motion requesting a modification of the current discovery schedule in error. That motion is ECF No. 47 on this cases docket. Immediately after filing the letter motion, defendants requested that the Court remove the motion from the docket (ECF No. 48). The Clerk of the Court is Ordered to strike ECF No. 47. The Clerk is further directed to send copies of this Order to the parties eitherelectronically through the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system or by mail. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/23/2021. (Herrera, Isaiah)
September 20, 2021 Filing 48 Letter MOTION for Discovery Request for Removal of Document no. 47 by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. (Varriale-Barker, Carla)
September 20, 2021 Filing 47 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference , Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. (Varriale-Barker, Carla) STRICKEN pursuant to #49 Order of Judge [Pollak]. This entry has been modified on 9/23/2021 to indicate order #49 has been Stricken . Modified on 9/23/2021 (Herrera, Isaiah).
August 25, 2021 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Service of Discovery by Dorina Sokolovsky (James, Leander)
July 15, 2021 MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference proceeding held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak on 7/14/2021. Appearance for plaintiff: Leander Laurel James, IV. Appearance for defendant: Christine Sara Varghese \ Aaron Twersky. Parties to exchange initial disclosures in 2 weeks if not already exchanged. Parties to exchange document requests and interrogatories by 8/16/2021 - responses due 9/24/2021. Parties to confer on confidentiality agreement. Status Conference set for 10/14/2021 @ 10:15 AM. Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 10:15 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-4116. (Caggiano, Diana)
July 13, 2021 Filing 45 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (James, Leander)
July 1, 2021 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Service of Discovery by Dorina Sokolovsky (James, Leander)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 7/14/2021 @ 11:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-4116. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/16/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -- For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Oorah Defendants' motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice of their third-party action, ECF No. #36 , is GRANTED. All other requests for relief are DENIED. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 6/8/2021. (Almonte, Kelly)
June 8, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 05/27/2021, before Judge Diane Gujarati. Court Reporter/Transcriber V. Torres Butler. Email address: VButlerRPR@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 6/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2021. (Torres-Butler, Victoria)
June 1, 2021 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 11, 2021, before Judge Gujarati. Court Transcriber: Transcriptions Plus II, Inc.. Email address: laferrara44@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 6/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2021. (Rocco, Christine)
May 27, 2021 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gujarati: Oral argument on Oorah, Inc. and Oorah Catskills Retreat LLCs #36 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Action held before Judge Diane Gujarati on May 27, 2021. Leander James appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Carla Varriale-Barker and Christine Sara Varghese appeared on behalf of Defendants/Cross-Claimants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Oorah, Inc. and Oorah Catskills Retreat, LLC; Aaron Twersky appeared for Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Claimant Gittie Sheinkopf and Third-Party Defendants Marvin Kohn and Batsheva Kohn. Case called. The parties were heard on the motion. The Court reserved decision and will rule on the motion in due course. (Court Reporter Victoria Butler) (Almonte, Kelly)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral argument on Defendant's #36 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Action shall be held telephonically on Thursday, May 27, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839, and the access code is 2643682. Counsel should call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office. If any party has difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Gujarati_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 5/25/2021. (Almonte, Kelly)
April 13, 2021 Filing 38 REPLY in Support re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Action filed by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Varghese, Christine)
April 13, 2021 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Action filed by Batsheva Kohn, Marvin Kohn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Varghese, Christine)
April 13, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Action by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A) (Varghese, Christine)
March 23, 2021 Filing 35 Letter re Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Action Without Prejudice by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc. (Varghese, Christine)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #31 motion for pre motion conference -- The Court has reviewed the parties' pre-motion letters concerning Third-Party Plaintiffs' anticipated motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice and has determined that a pre-motion conference is not necessary. The motion shall be briefed as follows: Third-Party Plaintiffs shall serve their motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice on Third-Party Defendants by March 23, 2021. Third-Party Defendants shall serve their response on Third-Party Plaintiffs, if any, by April 6, 2021. Third-Party Plaintiffs shall serve their reply, if any, on Third-Party Defendants by April 13, 2021, at which point Third-Party Plaintiffs shall file the fully-briefed motion on ECF in accordance with Individual Rule III(B)(4). In light of Third-Party Plaintiffs' anticipated motion, the briefing schedule for Third-Party Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss the amended third-party complaint #29 is adjourned sine die. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 3/9/2021. (Almonte, Kelly)
March 7, 2021 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #27 Amended Third Party Complaint filed by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. (Varriale, Carla)
March 5, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #27 Amended Third Party Complaint filed by Batsheva Kohn, Marvin Kohn. (Twersky, Aaron)
February 28, 2021 Filing 31 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #27 Amended Third Party Complaint by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures) (Varriale, Carla)
February 26, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to #27 Amended Third Party Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Batsheva Kohn, Marvin Kohn. (Twersky, Aaron)
February 11, 2021 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gujarati: Pre-motion Conference held on February 11, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Leander James appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Carla Varriale-Barker and Christine Sara Varghese appeared on behalf of Defendants/Cross-Claimants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Oorah, Inc. and Oorah Catskills Retreat, LLC; Aaron Twersky appeared for Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Claimant Gittie Sheinkopf and Third-Party Defendants Marvin Kohn and Batsheva Kohn. Case called. Discussion held. The Court set the following deadlines: Third-Party Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, if any, due by February 25, 2021; Third-Party Defendants' anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Amended Third-Party Complaint or Second Amended Third-Party Complaint, if filed, shall be filed by March 18, 2021; any response or opposition shall be filed by April 1, 2021; and Third-Party Defendants shall file a reply, if any, by April 8, 2021. (FTR Log #20cv4116 2.11.21) (Burkett, Benjamin)
February 11, 2021 ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of the pending motion schedule, the initial conference previously scheduled for 2/26/2021 before Chief Magistrate Cheryl Pollak is adjourned sine die. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/11/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #28 Letter Motion for Pre-Motion Conference -- The motion is granted. The Court will proceed with the telephonic pre-motion conference scheduled for Thursday, February 11, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are reminded that the call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839, and the access code is 2643682. Counsel should call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office. If any party has difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Gujarati_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 2/10/2021. (Almonte, Kelly)
February 4, 2021 Filing 28 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #27 Amended Third Party Complaint, #9 Third Party Complaint by Batsheva Kohn, Marvin Kohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Pre-Motion Conference Letter) (Twersky, Aaron)
February 3, 2021 Filing 27 AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Batsheva Kohn, Marvin Kohn, filed by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Varriale, Carla)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #24 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference -- The Court will hold a telephonic pre-motion conference on Thursday, February 11, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839, and the access code is 2643682. Counsel should call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office. If any party has difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Gujarati_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 2/2/2021. (Almonte, Kelly)
January 29, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #23 Answer to Crossclaim, by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. (Varriale, Carla)
January 19, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #9 Third Party Complaint filed by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Third Party Complaint) (Varriale, Carla)
January 13, 2021 Filing 24 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #9 Third Party Complaint by Batsheva Kohn, Marvin Kohn. (Twersky, Aaron)
January 13, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc. by Gittie Sheinkopf. (Twersky, Aaron)
January 13, 2021 Filing 22 Verified ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Gittie Sheinkopf. (Twersky, Aaron)
December 17, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Dorina Sokolovsky (James, Leander)
December 17, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - ANSWER DUE 1/13/2021. The initial conference previously scheduled before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak has been adjourned to 2/26/2021 @ 9:45 AM. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 9:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-4116. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/17/2020. (Caggiano, Diana)
December 16, 2020 Filing 20 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #9 Third Party Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, by Batsheva Kohn, Marvin Kohn, Gittie Sheinkopf. (Twersky, Aaron)
December 16, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Twersky on behalf of Batsheva Kohn, Marvin Kohn, Gittie Sheinkopf (aty to be noticed) (Twersky, Aaron)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 1/8/2021 @ 9:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 9:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-4116. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/11/2020. (Caggiano, Diana)
December 11, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Diane Gujarati. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
November 18, 2020 Case Reassigned to Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Magistrate Judge James Orenstein no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
November 17, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. Marvin Kohn served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Varriale, Carla)
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. Batsheva Kohn served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Varriale, Carla)
November 4, 2020 Filing 15 THIRD PARTY Summons Reissued as to Batsheva Kohn, Marvin Kohn. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 Letter Regarding Corrected Proposed Summons by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc. (Varriale, Carla)
October 28, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. Re #9 Third Party Complaint by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc. (Varriale, Carla)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 THIRD PARTY Summons Issued as to Batsheva Kohn, Marvin Kohn. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. Re #9 Third Party Complaint by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc. (Varriale, Carla)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Sara Varghese on behalf of Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Varghese, Christine)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Marvin Kohn, Batsheva Kohn, filed by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Varriale, Carla)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oorah, Inc. (Varriale, Carla)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC identifying Corporate Parent Oorah, Inc. for Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC. (Varriale, Carla)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Gittie Sheinkopf by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. (Varriale, Carla)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent; Corporate Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by October 8, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/14/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc.. (Varriale, Carla)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Varriale on behalf of Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Varriale, Carla)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC, Oorah, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13306605) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Varriale, Carla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sokolovsky v. Oorah, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oorah Catskills Retreat LLC
Represented By: Carla Varriale
Represented By: Christine Sara Varghese
Represented By: Carla M. Varriale-Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gittie Sheinkopf
Represented By: Aaron Twersky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Zone
Represented By: Carla Varriale
Represented By: Christine Sara Varghese
Represented By: Carla M. Varriale-Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oorah, Inc.
Represented By: Carla Varriale
Represented By: Christine Sara Varghese
Represented By: Carla M. Varriale-Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorina Sokolovsky
Represented By: Leander Laurel James, IV
Represented By: Brianna M Espeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Batsheva Kohn
Represented By: Aaron Twersky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Marvin Kohn
Represented By: Aaron Twersky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?