Nagel v. Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Jody Nagel
Defendant: Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04126
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jody Nagel. Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA Inc. served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Leon, Louis)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Robreno Koster on behalf of Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Koster, Kelly)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA Inc.. Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA Inc. waiver sent on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Koster, Kelly)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13309320 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Jody Nagel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Leon, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagel v. Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Robreno Koster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Nagel
Represented By: Louis Moshe Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?