Madden v. City of New York
Plaintiff: Steven Madden
Defendant: City of New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv04295
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of New York. (Depugh, David)
October 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Madden. City of New York served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Complaint by City of NY) (Buchsbaum, Andrew)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Initial Conference will be held in this case on December 15, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By December 10, 2020, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that defendant is aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 9/16/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard D. Friedman on behalf of Steven Madden (aty to be noticed) (Friedman, Bernard)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of New York. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -n/a- individual plaintiff,, filed by Steven Madden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons vs City of New York, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Buchsbaum, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madden v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: David Lee Depugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Madden
Represented By: Andrew V. Buchsbaum
Represented By: Bernard D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?