Chais v. Air Europa Lineas Aereas, S.A.
Plaintiff: Mary Chais
Defendant: Air Europa Lineas Aereas, S.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04398
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 10/28/2020 conference, all discovery must be completed by 5/21/2021. On or before 5/21/2021, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 6/25/2021, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 7/23/2021, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. A Telephone Conference is set for 4/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 4/1/2021, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/28/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
October 28, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Telephone Conference held on 10/28/2020. Jessica Kronrad appearing for Plaintiff. Philip Weissman appearing for Defendant. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #12:31-12:57.) (Quinlan, Krista)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Scheduling Order Pursuant to Court's Initial Conference Order by Air Europa Lineas Aereas, S.A. (Weissman, Philip)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Richard Weissman on behalf of Air Europa Lineas Aereas, S.A. (aty to be noticed) (Weissman, Philip)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Kronrad on behalf of Mary Chais (aty to be noticed) (Kronrad, Jessica)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon. The Parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 10/22/2020. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/22/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Air Europa Lineas Aereas, S.A. from Supreme Court Queens Cty, case number 711501/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13386093) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Harakas, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chais v. Air Europa Lineas Aereas, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Chais
Represented By: Anthony Mallilo
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Kronrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Europa Lineas Aereas, S.A.
Represented By: Andrew John Harakas
Represented By: Philip Richard Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?