Duran v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rafael Duran
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv04542
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Zeigler on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Zeigler, Anne)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Paragraph 4 of the Scheduling Order, entered September 29, 2020 (ECF No. 4), is corrected as follows: By May 14, 2021, plaintiff shall serve its reply on defendant, and the parties shall file the entire set of motion papers, the stipulations of fact, and the administrative record with the court. The Commissioner shall promptly serve plaintiff with a copy of this Order and note service on the docket. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/8/2020. (Brasky, Michael)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's 9/29/2020 Scheduling Order and Plaintiff's Complaint shall be sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Commissioner shall serve the administrative record upon plaintiff, or otherwise move against the complaint, within ninety (90) days of commencement of the action; plaintiff shall move for judgment on the pleadings within sixty (60) days of service of the administrative record; the Commissioner shall serve his response within sixty (60) days thereafter; within twenty-one (21) days after receipt of the Commissioner's response, plaintiff shall service a reply on defendant, and the parties shall file the entire set of motion papers, the stipulations of fact, and the administrative record with the court. The parties shall confer and prepare a stipulation of facts with a chronology of medical treatment, to be filed on ECF on the date that the fully-briefed motions are due. The court also grants #2 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/29/2020. (Brasky, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Commissioner is ordered to serve a copy of #4 Scheduling Order on the plaintiff at his address of record and to note service on the docket. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/29/2020. (Brasky, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rafael Duran. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Rafael Duran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Anne Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?