A.S.A.P. Logistics, Ltd. v. UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: A.S.A.P. Logistics, Ltd.
Defendant: UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04553
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER: A telephonic pre-motion conference regarding Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss and motion for a more definite statement was held on November 13, 2020 before Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall. Daniel Friedman appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Steven Rappoport appeared on behalf of Defendant. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before December 4, 2020. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 11/13/2020. (Court Reporter Georgette Betts.) (Williams, Erica)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's motion for a pre-motion conference regarding Defendant's anticipated motions for a more definite statement and to dismiss and #7 is GRANTED. A telephonic pre-motion conference regarding Defendant's motions shall be held on November 13, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. The parties are directed to call 1-888-684-8852 and use the access code 1537693. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 10/30/2020. (Williams, Erica)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for pre motion conference Response by A.S.A.P. Logistics, Ltd.. (Friedman, Daniel)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: On October 5, 2020, Defendant filed a request for a pre-motion conference #7 regarding its anticipated motion to dismiss. In direct contravention of the Court's Individual Practices, Plaintiff failed to submit a letter response either opposing Defendant's motion or advising the Court that it does not intend to oppose the motion. Plaintiff is directed to file a response, not to exceed three (3) pages, by October 21, 2020. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 10/19/2020. (Williams, Erica)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. re #7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference (Rappoport, Steven)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.. (Rappoport, Steven)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet (Rappoport, Steven)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. (Rappoport, Steven)
September 25, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. for UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.. (Rappoport, Steven)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. from New York State Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 714336/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13420116) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rappoport, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.S.A.P. Logistics, Ltd. v. UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.A.P. Logistics, Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Thomas Rappoport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?