Marques et al v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Isabel Marques, Payam Rastegar and Syed Abdul Nafay
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor North America Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04804
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Kristen Shook on behalf of Toyota Motor North America Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Shook, Jessica)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric F. Gladbach on behalf of Toyota Motor North America Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Gladbach, Eric)
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John Hooper on behalf of Toyota Motor North America Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Hooper, John)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 7, 2020 The case of Marques et al v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al, has been transferred from Eastern District of Virginia to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 20cv4804. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00665. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2020 Case transferred to District of Eastern New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (dvanm, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that #11 the Joint Motion to Lift the Stay and Transfer to the Eastern District of New York is hereby GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/2/2020. (dvanm, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parrish, Ashley) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York and to Lift the Stay by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parrish, Ashley) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Deeming Motion Withdrawn entered by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (aott, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Joint Motion for a Stay Pending the JPML's Ruling is hereby GRANTED. Defendant, Toyota, shall file its response to the Complaint on or before twenty (20) days after the JPML issues its ruling, as necessary, on Plaintiffs Motion to Transfer to the Eastern District of Michigan Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 08/17/2020. (dvanm, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending JPML Ruling by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parrish, Ashley) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Parrish, Ashley) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice for Brian E. Johnson. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 6/22/2020. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian E. Johnson and Certification of Local Counsel Steven J. Toll Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7249530. for Plaintiffs by Isabel Marques, Syed Abdul Nafay, Payam Rastegar. (Toll, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Toyota Motor Corporation by Isabel Marques, Syed Abdul Nafay, Payam Rastegar. (Toll, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Toyota Motor North America, Inc. by Isabel Marques, Syed Abdul Nafay, Payam Rastegar. (Toll, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7247406.), filed by Isabel Marques, Syed Abdul Nafay, Payam Rastegar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Toll, Steven) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marques et al v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Marques
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payam Rastegar
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syed Abdul Nafay
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Kristen Shook
Represented By: John Hooper
Represented By: Ashley C. Parrish
Represented By: Eric F. Gladbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?