Holloway et al v. The City of New York
Plaintiff: Saquan Holloway and Erica Burgin
Defendant: The city of New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv04929
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. (Herrera, Isaiah)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-08066. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 6, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Order to Saquan Holloway, NYSID No. 02504533N at Vernon C. Bain Center, 1 Halleck Street, Bronx, NY 10474. (kh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff Saquan Holloway and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Holloway should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/2/20) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]
October 1, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]
September 29, 2020 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis See Document #1 by Saquan Holloway. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 29, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against The City of New York. Document filed by Saquan Holloway. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Saquan Holloway. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway et al v. The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The city of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saquan Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Burgin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?