Wu v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Shisheng Wu
Defendant: Mark Hazuda, Ken Cuccinelli, Acting Secretary DHS Chad Wolf and US Atty General William Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv04938
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dated 11/18/20 that this action is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and fees. ( Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 11/18/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Stipulation and Order of dismissal without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 11/16/2020. (Greene, Donna)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, respectfully submitted for the Court's endorsement by William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf (Modafferi, Matthew)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Modafferi on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Modafferi, Matthew)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shisheng Wu. William Barr served on 10/19/2020, answer due 12/18/2020; Ken Cuccinelli served on 10/19/2020, answer due 12/18/2020; Mark Hazuda served on 10/19/2020, answer due 12/18/2020; Chad Wolf served on 10/19/2020, answer due 12/18/2020. (Zheng, Taobo)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Shisheng Wu against William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13522805 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Shisheng Wu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Zheng, Taobo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazuda
Represented By: Matthew J. Modafferi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Matthew J. Modafferi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary DHS Chad Wolf
Represented By: Matthew J. Modafferi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Atty General William Barr
Represented By: Matthew J. Modafferi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shisheng Wu
Represented By: Taobo Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?