Volovets v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Naum I. Volovets
Defendant: William Barr, Mike Pompeo, Kristina Kvien and Donald J. Trump
Case Number: 1:2020cv05082
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the plaintiff take nothing of the defendants, that all claims brought by the plaintiff are dismissed, and that this case is hereby closed. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf, on 12/18/2020. (Copy of this Judgment and the attached appeals packet sent to pro se Plaintiff via regular mail.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Although Volovets paid the filing fee to commence this action, the complaint is dismissed. Accordingly, because granting leave to amend would be futile, and because Volovets's proposed amended complaint does not (and cannot) cure any of the deficiencies identified in this Memorandum and Order, Volovets's #11 motion to amend the complaint and #13 request for a hearing are denied. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants, to mail a copy of the judgment and this Memorandum and Order to Volovets, to note that mailing on the docket sheet, and to close thiscase. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf, on 12/18/2020. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
December 17, 2020 Filing 14 Various Documents filed by Naum I. Volovets (Almonte, Giselle)
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 Letter MOTION for Hearing by Naum I. Volovets. (Almonte, Giselle)
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 Letter dated December 15, 2020 to Douglas C. Palmer requesting email address to provide the court with additional documents, filed by Naum I. Volovets. (Almonte, Giselle)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 Letter MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #1 Complaint, by Naum I. Volovets. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (Almonte, Giselle)
November 23, 2020 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Almonte, Giselle)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification by Naum I. Volovets. (Almonte, Giselle)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Naum I. Volovets. William Barr served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020. (Almonte, Giselle)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Naum I. Volovets. Mike Pompeo served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020. (Almonte, Giselle)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Naum I. Volovets. Donald J. Trump served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020. (Almonte, Giselle)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-08504. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 15, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York. (va) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: Plaintiff has consented to electronic service of Court documents. (ECF 2.) The Court directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. This order closes this action. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/15/2020) (va) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.]
October 13, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Barr, Kristina Kvien, Mike Pompeo, Donald J. Trump..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Naum Volovets consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Naum I. Volovets. (rdz) Modified on 10/16/2020 (sac). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Barr, Kristina Kvien, Mike Pompeo, Donald J. Trump. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401268110)Document filed by Naum I. Volovets.(rdz) Modified on 10/16/2020 (sac). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volovets v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Kvien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naum I. Volovets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?