Philpot v. Metal Injection, LLC
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Metal Injection, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05143
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant Metal Injection, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to January 4, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/7/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
December 7, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or otherwise move/respond by Metal Injection, LLC. (Marino, Christopher)
December 2, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry G. Philpot. Metal Injection, LLC served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Hutcherson, Kenton)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenton J. Hutcherson on behalf of Larry G. Philpot (notification declined or already on case) (Hutcherson, Kenton)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Initial Conference will be held in this case on January 27, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected.Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By January 22, 2021, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that defendant is aware of this conference. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/27/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kenton Hutcherson is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Larry Philpot. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that they receive electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/27/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Metal Injection, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Larry G. Philpot Notice of Report on Copyright AO121 (Hutcherson, Kenton)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Larry G. Philpot (Hutcherson, Kenton)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13585594. by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Hutcherson, Kenton)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Larry G. Philpot (Hutcherson, Kenton)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metal Injection, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13584808 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hutcherson, Kenton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Metal Injection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metal Injection, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Kenton J. Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?