A.G. et al v. New York City Department of Education
Plaintiff: Lawrence Weinberg, A.G., J.T., E.H., R.I., C.C, R.S. and P.T.
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2020cv05211
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for New York City Department of Education Extension of Time to Answer 2/4/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/21/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
December 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by New York City Department of Education. (Rauchberg, Andrew) Modified on 12/21/2020 (Vertus, Miriam).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Defendant the New York City Department of Education Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint by 12/21/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/20/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by New York City Department of Education. (Rauchberg, Andrew) Modified on 11/19/2020 (Vertus, Miriam).
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew James Rauchberg on behalf of New York City Department of Education (aty to be noticed) (Rauchberg, Andrew)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vida M. Alvy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Alvy, Vida)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.H., P.T., R.S., J.T., Lawrence Weinberg, A.G., C.C, R.I.. All Defendants. (Alvy, Vida)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to New York City Department of Education. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by A.G., C.C, E.H., J.T., P.T., R.I., R.S., Lawrence Weinberg (Alvy, Vida)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Prevailing Party Attorney Fees against New York City Department of Education filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13602959 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by E.H., P.T., R.S., J.T., Lawrence Weinberg, A.G., C.C, R.I.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Alvy, Vida)
October 29, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.G. et al v. New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Weinberg
Represented By: Vida M. Alvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.G.
Represented By: Vida M. Alvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.T.
Represented By: Vida M. Alvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.H.
Represented By: Vida M. Alvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.I.
Represented By: Vida M. Alvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.C
Represented By: Vida M. Alvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.S.
Represented By: Vida M. Alvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.T.
Represented By: Vida M. Alvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Andrew James Rauchberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?