J.C. v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: J.C.
Defendant: The City of New York and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2020cv05712
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 3/12/2021. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel are advised that the 3/2/2021 Telephonic Initial Conference is rescheduled to 3/23/2021 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The Parties are to refer to #8 and must file the joint proposed scheduling order by 3/18/2021. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/14/2021. (Quinlan, Krista)
January 13, 2021 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by New York City Department of Education, The City of New York. (McAndrew, Amory)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amory Winslow McAndrew on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (McAndrew, Amory)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 2/12/2021. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 3/2/2021 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon. The Parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 2/25/2021. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 12/29/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by New York City Department of Education, The City of New York. (Rauchberg, Andrew) Modified on 12/29/2020 to correct motion type. (Quinlan, Krista).
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.C.. New York City Department of Education served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Hartley, Erika)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.C.. The City of New York served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Hartley, Erika)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 NYCD of Ed summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13731585 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by J.C. as mng K.J. and J.C. Individually. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Hartley, Erika)
November 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.C. v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C.
Represented By: Erika Louise Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Amory Winslow McAndrew
Represented By: Andrew James Rauchberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Amory Winslow McAndrew
Represented By: Andrew James Rauchberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?