Lin v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Ji Lin
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Loren K. Miller and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv05913
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial/telephone conference will be held at 10:30 A.M. on 3/5/2021 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the 10:30 A.M. conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 3/5/2021 Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/22/2020. (Manson, Eddie)
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ji Lin. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/15/2021; Loren K. Miller served on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/15/2021; Chad F. Wolf served on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts, #2 Exhibit USPS Online Proof of Delivery on U.S. Attorney Office EDNY) (Yerman, Gary)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Scott Weinberg on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Weinberg, Alex)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Miller summons, #2 Cuccinelli summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 12/7/2020. (Roeck, Victoria)
December 4, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Loren K. Miller, Chad F. Wolf filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13787532 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Ji Lin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Exhibit) (Yerman, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lin v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren K. Miller
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ji Lin
Represented By: Gary J. Yerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?