Yang et al v. Messer et al
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, 41-31 Haight Street Lender LLC and Gregory Messer
Appellant: Selena Chau and Tu Kang Yang
Case Number: 1:2020cv05964
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 Letter advising the District Court that the Settlement between the Parties was approved by the Bankruptcy Court subject to entry of the Stipulation and Order by Gregory Messer (Herbst, Gary)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Bankruptcy Record Received. Notice to all parties, in accordance with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), that the record has been received or is available electronically. Parties shall now follow briefing schedule as set forth in Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018. Specifically, appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days of this notice, the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days after service of the appellants brief, and the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellees brief, but a reply brief must be filed at least 7 days before scheduled argument. (Attachments: #1 Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (BK, #2 Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (BK: Notice Recipients) (Brown, Marc)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Appellants' Designation of Record and Other Deadlines While the Bankruptcy Court Considers the Proposed Settlement by Gregory Messer. (Loftin, Jacqulyn)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Appellee's letter application #2 with the consent of the Appellant's is GRANTED. This case is stayed, because counsel report that it has been settled. By January 25, 2021 the Appellee shall file either a stipulation withdrawing this appeal or a status report letter as to the proceeding in the Bankruptcy Court. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 12/21/2020. (Innelli, Michael)
December 9, 2020 Notice that appeal from the Bankruptcy Court has been docketed. Parties shall file with the Bankruptcy Clerk their designations of items to be included in the record and statement of issues to be presented pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-43441., filed by Tu Kang Yang, Selena Chau. (Attachments: #1 369 Transmittal, #2 357 Motion to Authorize, #3 386 Deficiency Notice, #4 367 Notice to Parties) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang et al v. Messer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Scott James Bogucki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: 41-31 Haight Street Lender LLC
Represented By: Steven H. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gregory Messer
Represented By: Gary F. Herbst
Represented By: Jacqulyn Somers Loftin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Selena Chau
Represented By: Eric J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tu Kang Yang
Represented By: Eric J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?