Ding et al v. The Mask Pot Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ai Min Ding and Jun Li
Defendant: Yunfu Yang, Hui Fang, Jian Liu, "John" Jin, The Mask Pot Inc. doing business as Xiang Hot Pot, Jin Wang, BK Spice World, Inc. doing business as Xiang Hot Pot, Wei Zhao, Yun Fu Yang and Howard Fang
Case Number: 1:2020cv06076
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 Motion for Defendants BK Spice World, Inc., Hui Fang and Wei Zhao Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint by 2/12/2021; granting #20 Motion for Defendants The Mask Pot Inc., and Yunfu Yang Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint by 2/12/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/14/2021. (Vertus, Miriam)
January 14, 2021 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Through February 12, 2021 by The Mask Pot Inc., Yunfu Yang. (Kung, Thomas)
January 14, 2021 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint Through February 12, 2021 by BK Spice World, Inc., Hui Fang, Wei Zhao. (Yam, Kevin)
January 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Hsien Chih Kung on behalf of The Mask Pot Inc., Yunfu Yang (aty to be noticed) (Kung, Thomas)
January 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin K. Yam on behalf of BK Spice World, Inc., Hui Fang, Wei Zhao (aty to be noticed) (Yam, Kevin)
December 28, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ai Min Ding. Wei Zhao served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS Photo) (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 28, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ai Min Ding. "John" Jin served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS Photo) (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 28, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ai Min Ding. Jian Liu served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS Photo) (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 28, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ai Min Ding. Yunfu Yang served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS Photo) (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 28, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ai Min Ding. Hui Fang served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS Photo) (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ai Min Ding. BK Spice World, Inc. served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS Photo) (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ai Min Ding. The Mask Pot Inc. served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS Photo) (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jun Li, Ai Min Ding. Jin Wang served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof Of Service Photo) (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Schweitzer on behalf of Ai Min Ding, Jun Li (aty to be noticed) (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Jun Li (Troy, John)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Ai Min Ding (Troy, John)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Ai Min Ding, Jun Li (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Troy, John)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BK Spice World, Inc., Hui Fang, "John" Jin, Jian Liu, The Mask Pot Inc., Jin Wang, Yunfu Yang, Wei Zhao filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13835352 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jun Li, Ai Min Ding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited) (Troy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ding et al v. The Mask Pot Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yunfu Yang
Represented By: Thomas Hsien Chih Kung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hui Fang
Represented By: Kevin K. Yam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "John" Jin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mask Pot Inc. doing business as Xiang Hot Pot
Represented By: Thomas Hsien Chih Kung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jin Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BK Spice World, Inc. doing business as Xiang Hot Pot
Represented By: Kevin K. Yam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wei Zhao
Represented By: Kevin K. Yam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yun Fu Yang
Represented By: Thomas Hsien Chih Kung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Fang
Represented By: Kevin K. Yam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ai Min Ding
Represented By: Aaron Schweitzer
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jun Li
Represented By: Aaron Schweitzer
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?