Singh v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Singh
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC and Doe Corporations 1-5
Case Number: 1:2020cv06179
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Wexler, Howard)
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Wexler, Howard)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 4/8/2021 @ 10:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 10:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-6179. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/8/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (On Consent) by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Wexler, Howard)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard M Wexler on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Wexler, Howard)
January 8, 2021 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - ANSWER DUE 2/12/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/8/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
December 31, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Singh. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Kovel, Daniel)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Richard Singh (Kovel, Daniel)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Richard Singh (Kovel, Daniel)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doe Corporations 1-5, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13869201 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Richard Singh. (Kovel, Daniel)
December 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Singh
Represented By: Daniel Harris Kovel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Howard M Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?