Sohail Rice Mills USA, Inc. et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Plaintiff: Zubair Chaudhry and Sohail Rice Mills USA, Inc.
Defendant: Director of USCIS Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) and Acting Secretary DHS Chad Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv06208
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Scott Weinberg on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Weinberg, Alex)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sohail Rice Mills USA, Inc., Zubair Chaudhry. Chad Wolf served on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Seff, Daniel)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sohail Rice Mills USA, Inc., Zubair Chaudhry. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Seff, Daniel)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sohail Rice Mills USA, Inc., Zubair Chaudhry. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) served on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Seff, Daniel)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Kenneth summons, #2 Chad summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, USCIS, Chad Wolf filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13877795 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Sohail Rice Mills USA, Inc., Zubair Chaudhry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to USCIS, #3 Proposed Summons to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, #4 Proposed Summons to Chad Wolf) (Seff, Daniel)
December 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sohail Rice Mills USA, Inc. et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of USCIS Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary DHS Chad Wolf
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zubair Chaudhry
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Seff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sohail Rice Mills USA, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Seff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?