Fareportal Holdings Inc. et al v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: Travelong, Inc., WK Travel, Inc., Fareportal Inc. and Fareportal Holdings Inc.
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00061
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Lois Bloom
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on Tuesday, March 16, 2021, at 2:00 p.m., before Judge Carol Bagley Amon, on Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss. The conference will be held by telephone. The parties are directed to call the toll free number 888-398-2342, no later than 1:50 p.m. on March 16, 2021, and enter the access code 1840743, followed by the pound key. These proceedings will be recorded by a court reporter. The attorneys are reminded that they are not to independently record any court proceedings, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 3/5/2021. (Morse, Allison)
March 4, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JetBlue Airways Corporation, filed by Travelong, Inc., Fareportal Holdings Inc., WK Travel, Inc., Fareportal Inc.. (Fernandez, Erica)
March 4, 2021 Filing 19 Letter response to JetBlues Pre Motion Letter by Fareportal Holdings Inc., Fareportal Inc., Travelong, Inc., WK Travel, Inc. (Olson, Steig)
February 26, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha Elena Vega-Gonzalez on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Vega-Gonzalez, Martha)
February 25, 2021 Filing 16 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference regarding a proposed motion to dismiss by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Schwed, Richard)
February 25, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JetBlue Airways Corporation (Schwed, Richard)
February 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Craner on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Craner, Matthew)
February 25, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard F. Schwed on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Schwed, Richard)
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Avi Grunfeld on behalf of Fareportal Holdings Inc., Fareportal Inc., Travelong, Inc., WK Travel, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Grunfeld, Avi)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant requests a 30-day extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' complaint, stating that it has not yet received the summons from the New York Secretary of State. ECF No. 11. Plaintiff conditionally consents to a 21-day extension. First requests for an extension of time to respond to the complaint are typically granted as a courtesy. Defendant's request is granted. Defendant shall respond to plaintiffs' complaint by March 1, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/29/2021. (Wilhelm, Samantha)
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 Letter request for extension to respond to Complaint by JetBlue Airways Corporation (Corcoran, Kieran)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelong, Inc., Fareportal Holdings Inc., WK Travel, Inc., Fareportal Inc.. JetBlue Airways Corporation served on 1/7/2021, answer due 1/28/2021. (Nikas, Luke)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Deknatel on behalf of Fareportal Holdings Inc., Fareportal Inc., Travelong, Inc., WK Travel, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Deknatel, Anna)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Corey Worcester on behalf of Fareportal Holdings Inc., Fareportal Inc., Travelong, Inc., WK Travel, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Worcester, Richard)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steig David Olson on behalf of Fareportal Holdings Inc., Fareportal Inc., Travelong, Inc., WK Travel, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Olson, Steig)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Steven Anten on behalf of Fareportal Holdings Inc., Fareportal Inc., Travelong, Inc., WK Travel, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Anten, Todd)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fareportal Holdings Inc., Fareportal Inc., Travelong, Inc., WK Travel, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fareportal Inc. for WK Travel, Inc.; Corporate Parent Fareportal Holdings Inc. for Fareportal Inc., Travelong, Inc.; Corporate Parent None for Fareportal Holdings Inc.. (Olson, Steig)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JetBlue Airways Corporation filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13941810 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Travelong, Inc., Fareportal Holdings Inc., WK Travel, Inc., Fareportal Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Olson, Steig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fareportal Holdings Inc. et al v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelong, Inc.
Represented By: Steig David Olson
Represented By: Anna Deknatel
Represented By: Avi Grunfeld
Represented By: Richard Corey Worcester
Represented By: Todd Steven Anten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WK Travel, Inc.
Represented By: Steig David Olson
Represented By: Anna Deknatel
Represented By: Avi Grunfeld
Represented By: Richard Corey Worcester
Represented By: Todd Steven Anten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fareportal Inc.
Represented By: Steig David Olson
Represented By: Anna Deknatel
Represented By: Avi Grunfeld
Represented By: Richard Corey Worcester
Represented By: Todd Steven Anten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fareportal Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Steig David Olson
Represented By: Anna Deknatel
Represented By: Avi Grunfeld
Represented By: Richard Corey Worcester
Represented By: Todd Steven Anten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Richard F. Schwed
Represented By: Martha Elena Vega-Gonzalez
Represented By: Matthew L. Craner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?