Abdulzalieva v. Advanced Domino, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tatyana Abdulzalieva
Defendant: Boris Salkinder, Domino Group, LLC, Progress VGA, LLC, Advanced Domino, Inc., Genadi Vinitski, Yakov Bekkerman and Aleksandr Maltsev
Case Number: 1:2021cv00124
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT pursuant to Court's February 5, 2021 Order (Maguire, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2021 Filing 23 Letter Defendants' Supplemental Letter in Connection with Initial Status Conference by Aleksandr Maltsev, Progress VGA, LLC (Konopka, Michael)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #22 Letter. Counsel is advised that any letter filed in this action must include in the ECF entry line a brief description of the subject matter of the letter, e.g., "Defendant's supplemental letter" not simply, "Letter", so that the docket remains intelligible. Do not refile. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/8/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
March 8, 2021 Filing 22 Letter by Advanced Domino, Inc., Yakov Bekkerman, Domino Group, LLC, Boris Salkinder, Genadi Vinitski (Qu, Ge)
March 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #21 joint letter. Both the Domino defendants' and the VGA defendants' portions of this letter are wholly inadequate. Defendants are directed to file a supplemental letter by 12:00 pm on 3/9/2021 describing the factual and legal bases for their defenses and cross-claim in detail, or the Court will find that defendants have willfully failed to comply with this Court's Order for the Initial Status Conference and will impose an appropriate preclusion order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(f). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/7/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
March 5, 2021 Filing 21 Letter pursuant to Initial Conference Order by Tatyana Abdulzalieva (Maguire, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Advanced Domino, Inc., Yakov Bekkerman, Domino Group, LLC, Boris Salkinder, Genadi Vinitski. (Qu, Ge)
March 5, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Domino, Inc., Domino Group, LLC (Qu, Ge)
March 5, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Advanced Domino, Inc., Yakov Bekkerman, Domino Group, LLC, Boris Salkinder, Genadi Vinitski by Aleksandr Maltsev, Progress VGA, LLC. (Konopka, Michael)
March 5, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aleksandr Maltsev, Progress VGA, LLC (Konopka, Michael)
March 5, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Konopka on behalf of Aleksandr Maltsev, Progress VGA, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Konopka, Michael)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 Notice of Consent to Change Attorney filed by Progress VGA, LLC. Attorney Melvin Barry Berfond for Progress VGA, LLC added. Attorney Ge Qu terminated. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/3/2021 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Melvin Barry Berfond (Berfond, Melvin)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Notice of Consent to Change Attorney filed by Aleksandr Maltsev. Attorney Melvin Barry Berfond for Aleksandr Maltsev added. Attorney Ge Qu terminated. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/25/2021 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
February 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Melvin Barry Berfond (Berfond, Melvin)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 . Defendants' time to answer is extended to 3/5/2021. Telephonic initial status conference is adjourned to 3/10/2021 at 12:00 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 0124#. The parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements set forth at #5 , including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/5/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference initial conference by Advanced Domino, Inc., Yakov Bekkerman, Domino Group, LLC, Aleksandr Maltsev, Progress VGA, LLC, Boris Salkinder, Genadi Vinitski. (Qu, Ge)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ge Qu on behalf of Advanced Domino, Inc., Yakov Bekkerman, Domino Group, LLC, Aleksandr Maltsev, Progress VGA, LLC, Boris Salkinder, Genadi Vinitski (aty to be noticed) (Qu, Ge)
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Tatyana Abdulzalieva (Marino, Justin)
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tatyana Abdulzalieva. Progress VGA, LLC served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (Maguire, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tatyana Abdulzalieva. Domino Group, LLC served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (Maguire, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tatyana Abdulzalieva. Advanced Domino, Inc. served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (Maguire, Jeffrey)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 2/24/2021 at 2:30 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 0124#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements, including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/11/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Advanced Domino, Inc., Yakov Bekkerman, Domino Group, LLC, Aleksandr Maltsev, Progress VGA, LLC, Boris Salkinder, Genadi Vinitski. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 11, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Domino, Inc., Yakov Bekkerman, Domino Group, LLC, Aleksandr Maltsev, Progress VGA, LLC, Boris Salkinder, Genadi Vinitski filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13962255 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Tatyana Abdulzalieva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Supplement 29 U.S.C. 216(b) opt in form) (Maguire, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdulzalieva v. Advanced Domino, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boris Salkinder
Represented By: Ge Qu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino Group, LLC
Represented By: Ge Qu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress VGA, LLC
Represented By: Melvin Barry Berfond
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Michael Konopka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Domino, Inc.
Represented By: Ge Qu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genadi Vinitski
Represented By: Ge Qu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yakov Bekkerman
Represented By: Ge Qu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleksandr Maltsev
Represented By: Melvin Barry Berfond
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Michael Konopka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatyana Abdulzalieva
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?