Kim v. Korean Air lines et al
Plaintiff: Hannah Kim
Defendant: John Doe's 1-5, ABC Companies 1-5, Delta Air Lines and Korean Air Lines Co Ltd
Arbitrator: arbnwk
Case Number: 1:2021cv00208
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Robert M Levy
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 31 Letter Pre-Motion by Delta Air Lines (Revilla, Stephanie)
March 1, 2021 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Delta Air Lines identifying Corporate Parent Delta Airlines, Inc. for Delta Air Lines. (Revilla, Stephanie)
March 1, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint by Delta Air Lines. (Revilla, Stephanie)
February 26, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for pre motion conference by Delta Air Lines. (Revilla, Stephanie)
February 26, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by Delta Air Lines. (Revilla, Stephanie)
February 26, 2021 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Delta Air Lines (Revilla, Stephanie)
January 28, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane A. Sullivan on behalf of Hannah Kim (aty to be noticed) (Sullivan, Shane)
January 27, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Time for Delta Air Lines to Answer Complaint by Delta Air Lines (Revilla, Stephanie)
January 26, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Korean Air Lines Co Ltd. (Harakas, Andrew)
January 26, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Korean Air Lines Co Ltd (Harakas, Andrew)
January 14, 2021 Filing 21 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 14, 2021 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:20-cv-03636. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #9 , #10 motions to dismiss; transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 1/14/2021. (lag, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Filing 18 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 1/14/2021. (lag, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
January 14, 2021 The case of Kim v. Korean Air lines, has been transferred from District of New Jersey(Newark) to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 21-cv-208. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF in Support of Motion filed by KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (SARMIENTO, LEONARD) Modified on 8/3/2020 (dam, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF in Support of Motion filed by DELTA AIR LINES re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (SARMIENTO, LEONARD) Modified on 8/3/2020 (dam, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF in Opposition filed by HANNAH KIM re #10 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss (CEDZIDLO, MARTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Rule 7.1. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/9/2020. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
July 9, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 8/3/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by HANNAH KIM re #10 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss (CEDZIDLO, MARTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DELTA AIR LINES. (REVILLA, STEPHANIE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD identifying HANJIN GROUP and KOREAN NPS as Corporate Parent(s).. (REVILLA, STEPHANIE) Modified on 6/22/2020 (dam, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss, and #10 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss. Motions set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by DELTA AIR LINES. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(REVILLA, STEPHANIE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Declaration, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(REVILLA, STEPHANIE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER extending KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD. and DELTA AIR LINES, INC.'s time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint re #7 Stipulation. The time within which Defendants KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD. and DELTA AIR LINES, INC. may move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to 6/19/2020. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/8/2020. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by DELTA AIR LINES, KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD. (REVILLA, STEPHANIE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER extending KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD. and DELTA AIR LINES, INC.'s Time to Answer re #4 Stipulation. Defendants KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD. and DELTA AIR LINES, INC. may move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to 6/5/2020. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/20/2020. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LEONARD SARMIENTO on behalf of DELTA AIR LINES, KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD (SARMIENTO, LEONARD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd. and Delta Air Lines, Inc.'s Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD. (REVILLA, STEPHANIE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE MARIE REVILLA on behalf of KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD (REVILLA, STEPHANIE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD identifying Korean Air Lines Co Ltd as Corporate Parent.. (REVILLA, STEPHANIE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD from Superior Court Bergen County, case number BER-L-008506-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10641800), filed by KOREAN AIR LINES CO., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Statement)(REVILLA, STEPHANIE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]
April 3, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/14/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. Korean Air lines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe's 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines
Represented By: Leonard Sarmiento
Represented By: Stephanie Marie Revilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korean Air Lines Co Ltd
Represented By: Stephanie Marie Revilla
Represented By: Leonard Sarmiento
Represented By: Andrew John Harakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Arbitrator: arbnwk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Kim
Represented By: MARTIN S. CEDZIDLO
Represented By: Shane A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?