Abdullah v. Roman
Plaintiff: Bailah Abdullah
Defendant: The City of New York and Daniel Roman
Case Number: 1:2021cv00823
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Detective Daniel Roman. (Courtesy copies of the 4/15/2021 Summons, the Court's 3/3/2021 Memorandum & Order, and Plaintiff's #2 Complaint sent to the Office of the Corporation Counsel via first class mail.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. For the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum and order, plaintiff's claims against the City of New York are dismissed, as is any malicious prosecution claim contained in the complaint against an unnamed assistant district attorney. No summons shall issue as to the City of New York, and the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to correct the caption to reflect its dismissal. Plaintiff may amend the complaint within 30 days of this order. Further proceedings in this case are stayed for 30 days. If plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court shall issue a summons to the remaining defendant, Detective Daniel Roman. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order to plaintiff and note the mailing on the docket. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/3/2021. (Kahwash, Sarah)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00985. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 8, 2021 Mailed a copy of #4 Order, to Bailah Abdullah, NYSID: 05999289J, B&C No. 1412002353 at George R. Vierno Center, 09-09 Hazen Street, East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (dsh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/16/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court further directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/5/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/16/2021.]
February 5, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/16/2021.]
February 3, 2021 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SEE ENTRY #1 by Bailah Abdullah. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Bailah Abdullah. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/16/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Daniel Roman, The City of New York. Document filed by Bailah Abdullah. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/16/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Bailah Abdullah. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/16/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdullah v. Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bailah Abdullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?