John et al v. Central Loan Administration & Reporting (Cenlar) et al
Plaintiff: Garth Gary John and Denise N. Edwards-John
Defendant: FNC Insurance Agency, 110/174 Holding LLC, Central Loan Administration & Reporting (Cenlar) and Citimortgage Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01411
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed without prejudice, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and because it is frivolous; that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), any appeal would not be taken in good faith; that in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal, See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962); and that judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendants. Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 4/15/2021. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECISION & ORDER: On March 11, 2021, Garth Gary John and Denise N. Edwards-John ("Plaintiffs"), proceeding pro se, filed a "Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award" (hereafter "Complaint"), ECF No. #1 . Plaintiffs assert that an arbitration award of $1,434,000.00 has been entered against Defendants, which Plaintiffs now seek to enforce under the Federal Arbitration Act ("FAA"). Plaintiffs paid the filing fee to commence this action. Although Plaintiffs paid the filing fee to commence this action, the Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants, mail a copy of this Order and the judgment to Plaintiffs, note the mailing on the docket, and close the case. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 4/13/2021. (Love, Alexis)
March 30, 2021 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification by Denise N. Edwards-John. (Email not provided) (Tavarez, Jennifer) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Tavarez, Jennifer).
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification by Garth Gary John. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number 4653155893 (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Invocation (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Garth Gary John, Denise N. Edwards-John. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Lists of Exhibits, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Affidavit in Support) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John et al v. Central Loan Administration & Reporting (Cenlar) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garth Gary John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise N. Edwards-John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNC Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 110/174 Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Loan Administration & Reporting (Cenlar)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citimortgage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?