Corso v. Concordia Healthcare, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Corso
Defendant: Concordia Healthcare, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01459
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Filing 27 Proposed Scheduling Order by Joseph Corso (Gordon, David)
May 16, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Concordia Healthcare, Inc.. (McNeely, Kaleb)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Conference is set for 5/26/2022 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 5/17/2022, the parties will file a joint proposed schedule and the parties should also expect to discuss scheduling of settlement conference during the appearance. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and dial the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/3/2022. (Dessources, Jose)
May 2, 2022 Minute Entry for oral argument held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon on May 2, 2022. Appearances: For plaintiff: David B. Gordon. For defendant: William J. Miller. As stated on the record, defendant's motion to dismiss, or, in the alternative, to transfer venue, is denied. The parties are directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Vera Scanlon to schedule a settlement conference. (Court Reporter Victoria Torres-Butler) (Edelman, Zachary)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to an unforeseen conflict, oral argument is rescheduled until today, May 2, 2022, at 3pm. SO ORDERED by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on May 2, 2022. (Edelman, Zachary)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to an unforeseen conflict, oral argument is rescheduled until May 2, 2022 at 2pm. SO ORDERED by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on April 26, 2022. (Edelman, Zachary)
April 8, 2022 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Corso. (Gordon, David)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff will file a supplemental brief limited to the issue of whether Corso is bound by the APA's forum selection clause as a third-party beneficiary by April 14, 2022. Oral argument is rescheduled for April 28, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 3/31/2022. (Edelman, Zachary)
March 25, 2022 Filing 24 Letter to Judge Carol Bagley Amon by Concordia Healthcare, Inc. (McNeely, Kaleb)
March 25, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Concordia Healthcare, Inc.. (McNeely, Kaleb)
March 25, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Corso. (Gordon, David)
March 25, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Corso. (Gordon, David)
March 25, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Corso. (Gordon, David)
March 25, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Concordia Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (McNeely, Kaleb)
March 25, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Concordia Healthcare, Inc.. (McNeely, Kaleb)
March 25, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Concordia Healthcare, Inc.. (McNeely, Kaleb)
February 4, 2022 Filing 16 Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel re: Motion to Dismiss by Concordia Healthcare, Inc. (McNeely, Kaleb)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting the parties' joint request #15 to stay discovery pending resolution of dispositive motion practice before the Court. Within 7 days of the motion's resolution, if the action is not dismissed, the parties will file a joint status report with proposed dates for a discovery conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/24/2022. (Lozar, Ryan)
January 21, 2022 Filing 15 Letter Joint Status Letter by Concordia Healthcare, Inc. (McNeely, Kaleb)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's motion to dismiss shall be served on Plaintiff by February 4, 2022; Plaintiff's opposition shall be served on Defendant by March 4, 2022; Defendant's reply, if any, shall be served on Plaintiff by March 25, 2022. The parties are reminded to comply with this Court's Individual Rule 3(D), which provides that no motion papers shall be filed on the docket until the motion is fully briefed. Oral argument will be held April 8, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on January 21, 2022. (Edelman, Zachary)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER: Within ten days of the date of this Order, counsel are to file a joint status letter as to the status of the mediation in this case and in the Delaware case, and if the case has not settled, their respective positions as to whether discovery should proceed during the briefing of the motion to dismiss. If the case has not settled, they should also file the proposed briefing schedule required by the 7/1/2021 Order. If the case has settled, counsel should file the stipulation of dismissal expeditiously. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/13/2022. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 6, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Miller on behalf of Concordia Healthcare, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Miller, William)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER: A pre-motion conference was held on July 1, 2021 at 2:00pm before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Appearances: For Plaintiff: David Gordon, Esq.; For Defendant: William Miller, Esq.; Kaleb McNeely, Esq.As stated on the record, the parties are encouraged to work towards resolving this case during the upcoming mediation in Corso v. Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc., No. 1:21-cv-00353-LPS (D. Del.). If the parties successfully resolve this matter, they shall file a stipulation of dismissal. Should the parties not resolve this matter in the Delaware mediation and if the Defendant wishes to proceed with the motion, the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule for Defendant's motion to dismiss. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on July 1, 2021. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Marks, Aaron)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/1/2021. (Lozar, Ryan)
June 30, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William J. Miller Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14614836. by Concordia Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William J. Miller, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Miller, William)
June 29, 2021 Filing 12 Letter Equity Earnout Agreement by Concordia Healthcare, Inc. (McNeely, Kaleb)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant's pre-motion conference letter #10 cites to an "Equity Earnout Agreement" which was purportedly "attached hereto." No such document was attached to the pre-motion conference letter, nor has any such document been filed. No later than June 29, 2021, Defendant shall file a copy of the referenced "Equity Earnout Agreement." Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on June 28, 2021. (Marks, Aaron)
June 21, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Joseph Corso. (Gordon, David)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pre Motion Conference: A pre-motion conference will be held via telephone on July 1, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Counsel are directed to call the toll free number 888-398-2342, no later than 1:50 p.m. on July 1, 2021, and enter the access code 1840743, followed by the pound key. These proceedings will be recorded by a court reporter. The attorneys are reminded that they are not to independently record any court proceedings, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 6/21/2021. (Marks, Aaron)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Concordia Healthcare, Inc.. (McNeely, Kaleb)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Concordia Healthcare, Inc. (McNeely, Kaleb)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaleb McNeely on behalf of Concordia Healthcare, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (McNeely, Kaleb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Corso. Concordia Healthcare, Inc. served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Gordon, David)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Concordia Healthcare, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Joseph Corso (Gordon, David)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Joseph Corso (Gordon, David)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Concordia Healthcare, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14293723 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Joseph Corso. (Gordon, David)
March 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corso v. Concordia Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Corso
Represented By: David B. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concordia Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Kaleb McNeely
Represented By: William J Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?