Securities & Exchange Commission v. Uboh et al
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Defendant: Tyler Crockett and Ubong Uboh
Case Number: 1:2021cv02049
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
2 Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
3 Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 22 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter addressing May 10 docket order by Securities & Exchange Commission (Vasilescu, Alexander)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The SEC is Ordered to advise the Court whether Tyler Crockett has pleaded guilty in the criminal case referenced at paragraph 1 of the "Consent of Defendant Tyler Crockett" (ECF 8-1). If he has pleaded guilty, the SEC shall inform the court of the information missing from paragraph 1 of the "Consent of Defendant Tyler Crockett". Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/10/2021. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #8 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment (doc. 8-1). The court VACATES its earlier order entered today, 5/10/21, ordering that Plaintiff provide information regarding the criminal action referred to in paragraph 2 of the "Consent of Defendant Tyler Crockett" (doc 8-1 at page 5), which was attached to Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. The criminal case referred to in paragraph 2 (doc. 8-1 at page 5) appears to be UNDER SEAL, and it appears that plaintiff may have revealed sealed information from that criminal case. Consequently, the court ORDERS that pages 5 through 11 of document 8-1 be sealed, and that plaintiff explain no later than May 11, 2021, its views as to whether the content of paragraph 2 was disclosed in violation of the court's sealing order in the criminal action.Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/10/2021. (Matsumoto, Kiyo)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment) (Vasilescu, Alexander)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak for all further proceedings. Judge Diane Gujarati, Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/22/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter regarding case being related to a criminal case by Securities & Exchange Commission (Vasilescu, Alexander)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander M. Vasilescu on behalf of Securities & Exchange Commission (aty to be noticed) (Vasilescu, Alexander)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Securities & Exchange Commission (Best, Richard)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Securities & Exchange Commission (Best, Richard)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tyler Crockett, Ubong Uboh Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Best, Richard)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities & Exchange Commission v. Uboh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Crockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubong Uboh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By: Richard R. Best
Represented By: Alexander M. Vasilescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?