Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc. v. Elantra Logistics Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc.
Defendant: Raymond Roemer, Andrew Feinman, Jenchi Ku, JSG Transport, LLC, Elantra Logistics Inc., Penske Truck Leasing, Pai Ling Chen and Jose Calderon
Respondent: tq logistics
Arbitrator: ABC Insurance Companies 1-20
Case Number: 1:2021cv02117
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's answer to counterclaim filed 5/28/2021 shall be deemed timely filed. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/11/2021. (Bayer, Sarah)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaim by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc.. (Kupfer, David)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Penske Truck Leasing, Raymond Roemer, tq logistics. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sydney Sanchez, #2 Exhibit A (Plaintiff's Complaint), #3 Exhibit B (Ku Lawsuit Complaint), #4 Exhibit C (Ku Lawsuit Verified Amended Complaint), #5 Exhibit D (Ku Lawsuit Stip of Discontunance), #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Sanchez, Sydney)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE by Elantra Logistics Inc., Andrew Feinman re #50 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Claim (Lentini, Vincent)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CLAIM Answer to Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs. (Kupfer, David)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ann M. Donnelly: Pre Motion Conference held on 5/27/2021. David Kupfer appeared for the plaintiff. Sydney Sanchez appeared for Penske Truck Leasing, Raymond Roemer and TQ Logistics. Vincent Lentini appeared for Elantra Logistics Inc. and Andrew Feinman. Steven Weissler appeared for Jenchi Ku. Case called. Discussion held. Defendants Penske Truck Leasing, Raymond Roemer and TQ Logistics are directed to submit their motion to dismiss by May 28, 2021. The plaintiff's opposition is due by June 25, 2021. The defendants' reply is due by July 9, 2021. (Court Reporter Michele Nardone.) (Singer, Julie)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Request for Certificate of Default by Elantra Logistics Inc., Andrew Feinman (Lentini, Vincent)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER to #46 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Elantra Logistics Inc., Andrew Feinman. (Lentini, Vincent)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for pre motion conference by Elantra Logistics Inc., Andrew Feinman. (Lentini, Vincent)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Jenchi Ku. (Weissler, Steven)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #43 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. A pre-motion conference is set for May 27, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. via telephone conference (line (888) 363-4734, access code 9057625). Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 5/11/2021. (Singer, Julie)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Weissler on behalf of Jenchi Ku (aty to be noticed) (Weissler, Steven)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Letter Reply to Pre-Motion Correspondence by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc. (Kupfer, David)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The plaintiff's response to the motion for a pre-motion conference brought by Penske Truck Leasing, Raymond Roemer and TQ Logistics is due by April 28, 2021. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 4/22/2021. (Singer, Julie)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 First MOTION for pre motion conference by Penske Truck Leasing, Raymond Roemer, tq logistics. (Sanchez, Sydney)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-01065. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE US DISTRICT CT EDNY. It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between plaintiff and defendants Elantra Logistics Inc., and Andrew Feinman ("Elentra Defendants) and defendants Q Logistics, Penske Truck Leasing and Ray.mond Roemer ("Penske Defendants") that this matter is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. This stipulation may be executed in counterpart and by facsimile which when taken together will constitute one original. In light of the parties' stipulation, all deadlines and conferences in this case are adjourned sine die. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/16/2021) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order The case of Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc. v. Elantra Logistics Inc. et al, has been transferred from Southern District of New York to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 21cv2117. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of stipulation to change venue to EDNY re: #38 Letter. Document filed by Elantra Logistics Inc., Andrew Feinman..(Lentini, Vincent) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Vincent M. Lentini dated April 16, 2021 re: agrrement of parties to transfer venue. Document filed by Elantra Logistics Inc., Andrew Feinman..(Lentini, Vincent) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Plaintiff's request for an extension until April 21, 2021 to advise the Court on the venue issue is denied. Instead, the parties shall advise the Court on their respective beliefs regarding whether venue is proper in this Court by close of business on April 19, 2021. In addition, on February 10, 2021, the Court scheduled an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") for April 7, 2021 at 11:00 a.m., Dkt. 22, which was later adjourned to April 20, 2021, Dkt. 33. The Court's February 10, 2021 Order directed counsel to submit a joint letter regarding certain subjects to be considered at the IPTC and a proposed Case Management Plan "[n]o later than seven days prior to the IPTC." Dkt. 22. The parties have not submitted these materials, which were due April 13, 2021. Therefore, unless the parties agree that venue is not proper in this Court, the parties also must submit their joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan by close of business on April 19, 2021. SO ORDERED. (The following hearing(s) was terminated: Initial Conference.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/14/2021) (rjm). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from David M. Kupfer dated April 14 2021 re: extension regarding venue. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc...(Kupfer, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #34 SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Sydney Sanchez dated April 8, 2021 re: Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Penske Truck Leasing, Raymond Roemer, TQ Logistics. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss by April 23, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its opposition by May 7, 2021, and Defendants shall file their reply, if any, by May 14, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 4/23/2021. Responses due by 5/7/2021. Replies due by 5/14/2021.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/14/2021) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Sydney Sanchez dated April 8, 2021 re: Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Penske Truck Leasing, Raymond Roemer, TQ Logistics..(Sanchez, Sydney) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER The Initial Pretrial Conference Scheduled for Wednesday, April 7, 2021 at 11:00a.m. is adjourned to Tuesday, April 20th, at 11:00a.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan) (Text Only Order) (mhe) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Cronan: Telephone Conference held on March 25, 2021. Parties shall advise the Court in two weeks if they are unable to reach a resolution concerning dismissal as to certain Defendants. Parties shall meet and confer to discuss basis for venue and advise Court in two weeks as to whether the parties believe the case should be transferred on venue grounds. (No Court Reporter Present) (mhe) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pai Ling Chen..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pai Ling Chen, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc...(Kupfer, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Conference re: #27 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Sydney Sanchez dated March 10, 2021. The Court is in receipt of a letter from Defendants TQ Logistics, Penske Truck Leasing, and Raymond Roemer requesting a pre-motion conference in anticipation of making a motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, Dkt. 27, and a letter response from Plaintiff opposing the dismissal, Dkt. 29. It is hereby ORDERED that the Court will hold a teleconference to discuss the anticipated motion to dismiss on March 25, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending docket number 27. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 3/25/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/19/2021) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from David M. Kupfer, Esq. dated March 18, 2021 re: Reply to Pre Motion Letter. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit).(Kupfer, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER with respect to #27 Letter Motion for Conference re: #27 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Sydney Sanchez dated March 10, 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' letter by March 18, 2021. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/16/2021) (nb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/18/2021 (nb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Sydney Sanchez dated March 10, 2021. Document filed by Penske Truck Leasing, Raymond Roemer, TQ Logistics..(Sanchez, Sydney) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sydney Swaner Sanchez on behalf of Penske Truck Leasing, Raymond Roemer, TQ Logistics..(Sanchez, Sydney) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to #24 Counterclaim., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Andrew Feinman, Elantra Logistics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B).(Lentini, Vincent) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Andrew Feinman, Elantra Logistics Inc...(Lentini, Vincent) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Elantra Logistics Inc...(Lentini, Vincent) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents ABC INSURANCE COMPANIES 1-20 (names being fictitious and unknown) added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,,..(Kupfer, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: This case has been assigned to the undersigned for all purposes. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. Counsel for all parties are hereby ORDERED to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on April 7, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 4/7/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 2/10/2021) (cf) Modified on 2/11/2021 (cf). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TQ Logistics. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Raymond Roemer. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JSG Transport, LLC. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jose Calderon. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jenchi Ku. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elantra Logistics Inc.. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Feinman. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Michael Kupfer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Michael Kupfer to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; ABC Insurance Companies 1-20 (names being fictitious and unknown) must be added. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Michael Kupfer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Andrew Feinman; JSG Transport, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Michael Kupfer to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name must match exactly as pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Michael Kupfer to RE-FILE Document No. #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): only party as to whom the summons request is for can be listed in docket entry, c/o can be listed on PDF only. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TQ Logistics, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc...(Kupfer, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TG via Registered Agent, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc..(Kupfer, David) Modified on 2/8/2021 (sj). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Raymond Roemer, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc...(Kupfer, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Penske Truck Leasing, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc...(Kupfer, David) Modified on 2/8/2021 (sj). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Penske c-o Corporation Service Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc..(Kupfer, David) Modified on 2/8/2021 (sj). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JSG Transport, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc...(Kupfer, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JSG Transport care of John Gordon, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc..(Kupfer, David) Modified on 2/8/2021 (sj). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jose Calderon, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc...(Kupfer, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JenChi Ku, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc...(Kupfer, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elantra Logistics, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc...(Kupfer, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elantra Logistics co Feinman, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc..(Kupfer, David) Modified on 2/8/2021 (sj). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Feinman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc...(Kupfer, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kupfer, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23838787)Document filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Loss Adjust and Collateral Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Coverage Request Form, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Personal Guarantee and Indemnity Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Email Chain).(Kupfer, David) Modified on 2/8/2021 (sj). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/19/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc. v. Elantra Logistics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Arbitrator: ABC Insurance Companies 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Roemer
Represented By: Sydney Swaner Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Feinman
Represented By: Vincent M. Lentini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenchi Ku
Represented By: Steven J. Weissler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSG Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elantra Logistics Inc.
Represented By: Vincent M. Lentini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing
Represented By: Sydney Swaner Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pai Ling Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc.
Represented By: David M Kupfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: tq logistics
Represented By: Sydney Swaner Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?