Yancey v. Whitley
Plaintiff: TONY V. YANCEY
Defendant: JOHN E. WHITLEY, Acting Secretary of the Army and John E. Whitley
Case Number: 1:2021cv02374
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Margo K Brodie
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Daniel Volpe on behalf of John E. Whitley (aty to be noticed) (Volpe, Christopher)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony V. Yancey. (Gordon, Osher)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony V. Yancey. (Gordon, Osher)
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony V. Yancey. John E. Whitley served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. (Gordon, Osher)
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to John E. Whitley, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by TONY V. YANCEY (Gordon, Osher)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by TONY V. YANCEY (Gordon, Osher)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN E. WHITLEY, Acting Secretary of the Army filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14423525 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by TONY V. YANCEY. (Gordon, Osher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yancey v. Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY V. YANCEY
Represented By: Osher Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN E. WHITLEY, Acting Secretary of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Whitley
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Volpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?