Margolies v. Rudolph et al
Plaintiff: Robert Margolies
Defendant: Jen Rudolph, Jennifer Rudolph and The Actor's Green Room LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02447
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2022 Filing 33 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jen Rudolph. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Memorandum in Opposition, #3 Exhibit, #4 Reply) (Reich, Stephen)
October 3, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Name of Law Firm and Email Address Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Choudhry, Kiren)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule #31 . Defendants shall serve their motion to dismiss by 8/26/2022, Plaintiff shall serve any response by 10/7/2022, and Defendants shall serve any reply by 10/18/2022. Filing of all briefs on the docket should be made only upon service of reply papers. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 7/19/2022. (Bruckner, Ian)
July 18, 2022 Filing 31 Letter Re: Parties Briefing Schedule by Robert Margolies (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Setting Briefing Schedule) (Choudhry, Kiren)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: If Defendants intend to move to dismiss the Amended Complaint in lieu of answering, the parties should submit a jointly agreed-upon briefing schedule by 7/21/2022. The briefing schedule should, as a courtesy to the Court, have the parties serve opening and response briefs, and filing of all briefs on the docket should be made only upon service of reply papers. Should Defendants intend to answer, they may so indicate by 7/21/2022 and the Court will schedule a Rule 16 conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 7/7/2022. (Bruckner, Ian)
July 6, 2022 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Margolies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Choudhry, Kiren)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: For the reasons explained in the attached order, the motion to dismiss #24 is hereby granted. All claims in the Amended Complaint #7 are dismissed. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by July 6, 2022 that addresses the deficiencies identified. Should Plaintiff fail to file an amended complaint, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment dismissing the case with prejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/6/2022. (Bruckner, Ian)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to hold a conference #26 to address Plaintiff's allegedly improper behavior is denied. The parties may take up these issues and messages--and their import--at depositions of parties and witnesses. The Court finds no reason for Court intervention or supervision at this time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/3/2022. (Bruckner, Ian)
March 2, 2022 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 Letter MOTION for Hearing Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37(3)(c) filed by Robert Margolies. (Choudhry, Kiren)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to respond to the motion #26 filed by Defendants by 3/2/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 2/23/2022. (Bruckner, Ian)
February 22, 2022 Filing 27 Letter to Advise of Additional Exhibit by Jen Rudolph, The Actor's Green Room LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D) (Reich, Stephen)
February 22, 2022 Filing 26 Letter MOTION for Hearing Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37(3)(c) by Jen Rudolph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Reich, Stephen)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Pre Motion Conference #15 , is hereby denied as moot. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 2/10/2022. (Manson, Eddie) .
September 13, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY in Support re #24 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and all parties' papers in opposition and reply Signed Attorney Declaration filed by Jen Rudolph, The Actor's Green Room LLC. (Reich, Stephen)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to file a motion to dismiss #23 is hereby granted. And the time to respond is extended three days. The deadline to file a motion to dismiss is extended to 9/13/2021. The first motion to dismiss #24 is deemed filed as of 9/13/21. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/13/2021. (Bruckner, Ian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 24 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and all parties' papers in opposition and reply by Jen Rudolph, The Actor's Green Room LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Affidavit in Opposition, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Memorandum in Opposition, #13 Declaration, #14 Exhibit, #15 Affidavit in Support, #16 Memorandum in Support) (Reich, Stephen)
September 10, 2021 Filing 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition et al. by Jen Rudolph, The Actor's Green Room LLC. (Reich, Stephen)
September 9, 2021 Filing 22 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as well as Plaintiff's Opposition, Affirmation and Exhibits thereto and Defendants' Reply by Jen Rudolph, The Actor's Green Room LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Affidavit in Opposition, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Memorandum in Opposition, #12 Declaration, #13 Affidavit in Support, #14 Memorandum in Support) (Reich, Stephen) (Modified: Motion terminated and re-filed correctly under ECF # 24.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
September 9, 2021 #22 Motion terminated (filed in error) and re-filed correctly under Docket Entry #24 . (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The parties' proposed briefing schedule #21 is so ordered. Defendants shall serve their motion to dismiss by 7/30/2021, Plaintiff shall serve his opposition by 8/31/2021, and Defendants shall serve their reply by 9/8/2021. Defendants shall file the fully briefed motion on the docket by 9/9/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 7/30/2021. (Altreuter, Sylvia)
July 29, 2021 Filing 21 Proposed Pretrial Order Setting Briefing Schedule by Robert Margolies (Choudhry, Kiren)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to stay discovery #20 is granted. Apart from the exchange of Rule 26 initial disclosures, discovery is stayed pending resolution of Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 7/29/2021. (Altreuter, Sylvia)
July 28, 2021 Filing 20 Letter Request to stay discovery by Robert Margolies (Choudhry, Kiren) Modified on 7/29/2021 (Altreuter, Sylvia) (modified to motion to stay).
July 27, 2021 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Judge Frederic Block no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (So Ordered by USDJ Frederick Block, on 7/27/2021) (Galeano, Sonia)
July 27, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Robert Margolies. (Choudhry, Kiren)
July 27, 2021 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (Galeano, Sonia)
July 20, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Choudhry, Kiren)
July 20, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Pretrial Order Stipulation and Proposed order Regarding Electronically Stored Information and Document Production by Robert Margolies (Choudhry, Kiren)
July 6, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for pre motion conference to Dismiss Complaint by Jen Rudolph, The Actor's Green Room LLC. (Reich, Stephen)
July 6, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jen Rudolph, The Actor's Green Room LLC (Reich, Stephen)
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Reich on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Reich, Stephen)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #7 Amended Complaint by Robert Margolies (Choudhry, Kiren)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held at 2:00 P.M. on 7/23/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendants of this scheduling order at the time Defendants makes an appearance with in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 7/23/2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/24/2021. (Manson, Eddie)
May 21, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Margolies. The Actor's Green Room LLC waiver sent on 5/5/2021, answer due 7/5/2021. (Choudhry, Kiren)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Margolies. Jen Rudolph waiver sent on 5/5/2021, answer due 7/5/2021. (Choudhry, Kiren)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court concludes that dismissal for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction is not appropriate at this time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/18/2021. (Altreuter, Sylvia)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,,,, by Robert Margolies (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Choudhry, Kiren)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Margolies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Choudhry, Kiren)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff initiated this action in federal court on May 3, 2021. (Dkt. No. #1 ). Plaintiff alleges this Court has diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a) because the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000 and the parties are diverse. (Id. para. 8). "The party seeking to invoke jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332 bears the burden of demonstrating that the grounds for diversity exist and that diversity is complete." Advani Enters., Inc. v. Underwriters at Lloyds, 140 F.3d 157, 160 (2d Cir. 1998).Section 1332(a) requires complete diversity among the plaintiffs and defendants for a federal court to exercise diversity jurisdiction. Herrick Co. v. SCS Commc'ns, Inc., 251 F.3d 315, 322 (2d Cir. 2001) ("[D]iversity jurisdiction is available only when all adverse parties to a litigation are completely diverse in their citizenships."). For the purposes of diversity, a limited liability company takes the citizenship of each of its members. Bayerische Landesbank v. Aladdin Cap. Mgmt. LLC, 692 F.3d 42, 49 (2d Cir. 2012). And "[f]or purposes of diversity jurisdiction, a party's citizenship depends on [her] domicile." Linardos v. Fortuna, 157 F.3d 945, 948 (2d Cir. 1998). "[T]he domicile of a party to a diversity of citizenship case is the place where that individual has a true, fixed home and principal establishment, and to which, whenever that person is absent from the jurisdiction, he or she has the intention of returning[.]" 13E Charles Alan Wright & Arthur R. Miller, Federal Practice and Procedure 3612 (3d ed. 2021); Palazzo ex rel. Delmage v. Corio, 232 F.3d 38, 42 (2d Cir. 2000).Plaintiff alleges diversity because he is a "resident" of California, Defendant Jen Rudolph is a "resident" of New York, and Defendant The Actor's Green Room LLC is organized in New York. (Dkt. No. #1 , paras. 11-13). The Complaint does not disclose the domicile of Plaintiff or Defendant Rudolph, and it does not disclose Defendant The Actor's Green Room LLC's members or their citizenships for the purposes of diversity. As a result, the Court is unable to conclude whether it possesses diversity jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). By 5/19/2021, Plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. To the extent that Plaintiff contends that there is diversity jurisdiction, he must allege the domicile of each of the members of The Actor's Green Room LLC. Failure to respond to this order to show cause will result in the action being dismissed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/5/2021. (Altreuter, Sylvia)
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 4, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Robert Margolies (Choudhry, Kiren)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by Robert Margolies (Choudhry, Kiren) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/5/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny).
May 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14430524 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by ROBERT MARGOLIES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Choudhry, Kiren)
May 3, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please submit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Margolies v. Rudolph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jen Rudolph
Represented By: Stephen Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Rudolph
Represented By: Stephen Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Actor's Green Room LLC
Represented By: Stephen Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Margolies
Represented By: Kiren Choudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?