Coastal Equities, Inc. v. Stephens
Plaintiff: Coastal Equities, Inc.
Defendant: Dudley Franklin Stephens
Case Number: 1:2021cv02470
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Dudley Franklin Stephens. (Guzzi, Roseann)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Petition re: Arbitration Award, by Coastal Equities, Inc. (Romano, Michael)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Dudley Franklin Stephens. (Guzzi, Roseann)
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Petition re: Arbitration Award, by Coastal Equities, Inc. (Romano, Michael)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 5, 2021 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14438853 (Romano, Michael)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coastal Equities, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Orange Street Holdings, Inc. for Coastal Equities, Inc.. (Romano, Michael)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Petition re: Arbitration Award, by Coastal Equities, Inc. (Romano, Michael)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION re: Arbitration Award - Motion for Confirmation of Arbitration Award, filed by Coastal Equities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Judgment, #5 Verification) (Romano, Michael)
May 4, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please submit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 4, 2021 The case of Coastal Equities, Inc. v. Stephens, has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. The case number is 21cv2470. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within seven (7) days. Select the event (Civil Case Filing Fee) and pay online. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coastal Equities, Inc. v. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coastal Equities, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Fj Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dudley Franklin Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?