Nobi v. Cluff et al
Plaintiff: Resma Nobi
Defendant: Howard Nelson Cluff and American Armored Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02509
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to Electronic Order of Remand. This action is remanded to the New York Supreme Court, Queens County, under Index No. 717662/2020. ***A certified copy of Order of Remand and docket sent via regular mail to Queens County Supreme Court, Civil Term, 88-11 Sutphin Boulevard, Jamaica, NY 11435.ATTN: Index No.:717662/2020 (Layne, Monique)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER OF REMAND TO STATE COURT: In light of Defendants' #6 second request to withdraw its #1 Notice of Removal, which explains that "[a]t this time, it does appear that there is no longer complete diversity jurisdiction between the parties which served as the sole basis for the federal jurisdiction in this action," the Court reconsiders and reverses its previous determination that removal was proper under 28 U.S.C. Section 1332. Therefore, this case is remanded to New York Supreme Court, Queens County, under Index No. 717662/2020, for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Following remand, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mark this case as closed. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 6/10/2021. (Irving, Louisa)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 Letter Second Letter to the Court Re: Withrawing Notice of Removal by American Armored Transport, Inc., Howard Nelson Cluff (Matthews, Brian)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Video Initial Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The parties are directed to appear via video using the Cisco Webex Meeting invitation link sent to the email addresses listed on the docket and all other participates may join by phone using the Toll number: 1-650-479-3207 and Access code: 172 232 2865. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 6/18/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/9/2021. (Vertus, Miriam)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: As Plaintiff has not moved for remand, the Court finds that the case should move forward. An Initial Conference may be scheduled by the Honorable Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., Magistrate Judge, at his convenience. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 6/9/2021. (Irving, Louisa)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Having reviewed Defendants' #1 Notice of Removal, the Court finds that Defendants have established jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1332 to remove this case to federal court because the parties are citizens of different states, and because the amount in controversy is more than $75,000, as evidenced by Plaintiff's April 2, 2021 Response to Demand for Ad Damnum demanding $1,500,000 in damages. See Moltner v. Starbucks Coffee Co., 624 F.3d 34 (2d Cir. 2010). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447, Plaintiff has until June 4, 2021 to move to remand this case on the basis of any defect other than lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 5/10/2021. (Irving, Louisa)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 Letter to Court Re Notice of Removal by American Armored Transport, Inc., Howard Nelson Cluff (Matthews, Brian)
May 7, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 6, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Armored Transport, Inc., Howard Nelson Cluff (Matthews, Brian)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Armored Transport, Inc., Howard Nelson Cluff (Matthews, Brian)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Armored Transport, Inc., Howard Nelson Cluff from Supreme Queens, case number 717662/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14442320) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Verified Answer w_ efile conf notice, #3 Exhibit Initial Demands on Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Demand Ad Damnum, #5 Exhibit Preliminary Conference Stipulation, #6 Exhibit BoP and SUpp BoP - Redacted, #7 Exhibit Notice to Admit and Response) (Matthews, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nobi v. Cluff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Nelson Cluff
Represented By: Brian J. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Armored Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resma Nobi
Represented By: Joseph A. Provenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?