Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd. v. Precision Pro Contracting Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd.
Defendant: Melvin Turner and Precision Pro Contracting Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03287
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1821
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court sets the following briefing schedule for Plaintiff's anticipated motion: Plaintiff shall submit their motion by Friday, September 10, 2021 at 5:00 P.M.; Defendant shall submit a response by Friday, October 22, 2021 at 5:00 P.M.; and Plaintiff shall submit a reply, if any, by Friday, November 19, 2021 at 5:00 P.M. (See Order for details) SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 8/3/2021. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sotomayor-Joint Pre Trial Order - So Ordered) (Nagi, Jason)
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Michael Forte on behalf of Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Forte, Stephen)
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A Nagi on behalf of Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd. (notification declined or already on case) (Nagi, Jason)
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY in Support re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Precision Pro Contracting Services, LLC, Melvin Turner. (Richland, Daniel)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd.. (Nagi, Jason)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Precision Pro Contracting Services, LLC, Melvin Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Email with Payoff Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Email with Payoff Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Email with Payoff Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Email with Payoff Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Email with Payoff Letter, #7 Exhibit G - Documents from Chase Proving Wire, #8 Exhibit H - Wire Confirmation Page) (Richland, Daniel)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Precision Pro Contracting Services, LLC, Melvin Turner by Precision Pro Contracting Services, LLC, Melvin Turner. (Richland, Daniel)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 9/22/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon. The parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 9/14/2021. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file proof of service on the docket.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/24/2021. (Lozar, Ryan)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Precision Pro Contracting Services, LLC, Melvin Turner. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 11, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Commercial Mortgage Foreclosure against Precision Pro Contracting Services, LLC, Melvin Turner filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14556778 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note and Allonge, #2 Exhibit Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Assignment of Rents, Leases and Other Contract Rights, #4 Exhibit Guaranty, #5 Exhibit Default Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplement Rule 7.1 Statement, #8 Proposed Summons Precision Pro Contracting Services, LLC, #9 Proposed Summons Melvin Turner) (Nagi, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd. v. Precision Pro Contracting Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Turner
Represented By: Daniel H. Richland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Pro Contracting Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel H. Richland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd.
Represented By: Jason A Nagi
Represented By: Stephen Michael Forte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?