Johnson v. Tellez
Plaintiff: Lamonte Johnson
Defendant: Warden Tellez and Warden Heriberto Tellez
Case Number: 1:2021cv03361
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter to Warden or Superintendent from Douglas C. Palmer re the Prisoner Authorization that requests and authorizes your agency to send a certified copy of plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months to this Court. The prisoner authorization further requests and authorizes your agency to calculate the amounts specified by 28 U.S.C. 1915, to deduct those amounts from plaintiff s prison trust fund account (or institutional equivalent) and to disburse those amounts to this Court. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Prisoner Authorization filed by Lamonte Johnson. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lamonte Johnson. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Heriberto Tellez Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Lamonte Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter re: this case) (Tavarez, Jennifer)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Request for the Court's "Urgent Assistance" filed by Lamonte Johnson. (See document for details.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. (Almonte, Giselle)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-05059. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #2 Order to Lamonte Johnson, ID: 83878053 at Metropolitan Detention Center, P.O. Box 329002, Brooklyn, NY 11232. (kh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes the case in the Southern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/8/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Letter dated 5/30/201 to Judge Mauskopf from Lamonte Johnson enclosed with a letter addressed to Judge McMahon. Pro se Plaintiff is requesting counsel be assigned to this matter. (See letter for details) (Tavarez, Jennifer)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tellez. Document filed by Lamonte Johnson. (sac) Modified on 6/8/2021 (sac). [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Tellez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamonte Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Tellez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Heriberto Tellez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?