Allstate Insurance Company et al v Medical Supply Depot Group Corp et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Nikolay Malinin, Medical Supply Depot Group Corp, ABC Corporations 1 through 5 and John Does 1 Through 5
Case Number: 1:2021cv03534
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 Letter Joint letter re: Initial Conference by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company (McKenney, James)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, to September 24, 2021 by Nikolay Malinin, Medical Supply Depot Group Corp. (Conroy, Matthew)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #10 . Defendants' portion of the letter is wholly inadequate. A blanket denial is not enough, and defendants must provide more detail about the bases for their contentions. Defendants are ordered to submit a supplemental letter describing the factual and legal bases for those defenses at least 24 hours before the Initial Status Conference, or the Court will find that defendants have willfully failed to comply with this Court's Order for the Initial Status Conference and will impose an appropriate preclusion order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(f). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/20/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 . Defendants' Medical Supply Depot Group Corp. and Malinin's time to answer is extended to 9/24/2021. The parties are reminded of their obligations to comply with the mandatory requirements at #4 with regard to the 8/25/2021 Initial Status Conference which includes filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/20/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Conroy on behalf of Nikolay Malinin, Medical Supply Depot Group Corp (aty to be noticed) (Conroy, Matthew)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company. Nikolay Malinin served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. (McKenney, James)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company. Medical Supply Depot Group Corp served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (McKenney, James)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nikolay Malinin, Medical Supply Depot Group Corp. (Guzzi, Roseann)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 8/25/2021 at 9:30 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 3534#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/13/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Pinzow, Lee)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14651401 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Appendix, #4 Compendium of Exhibits) (Pinzow, Lee)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER directing The Clerk is requested to (a) terminate all defendants in this action except Quality Med Equip Inc., Anzhelika Dzhurayeva, John Does 1 through 5, and ABC Corporations 1 through 5; (b) open separate index numbers for each of the group of plaintiffs and defendants listed as Groups 2 through 26 in the Group A Schedule annexed to plaintiffs' response (the new cases) ; (c) file this Order as the initial filing in each of the new cases; and (d) have each new case randomly assigned to a District Judge and Magistrate Judge. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Schedeule A) (Marziliano, August)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v Medical Supply Depot Group Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Scott Marvin
Represented By: James A McKenney
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Scott Marvin
Represented By: James A McKenney
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Scott Marvin
Represented By: James A McKenney
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikolay Malinin
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Supply Depot Group Corp
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 Through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?