Allstate Insurance Company et al v Strac Medical LLC et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Strac Medical LLC, John Does 1 Through 5, Roy DeVries, Thomas Cuomo and ABC Corporations 1 through 5
Case Number: 1:2021cv03539
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: Marcia M Henry
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants have until 10/08/2021 to answer the Complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 08/13/2021. (Gans, Courtney)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (McKenney, James)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Thomas Cuomo, Roy DeVries, Strac Medical LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 7/14/2021 (Bowens, Priscilla).
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Compendium of Exhibits, #4 Proposed Summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 7/14/2021 (Bowens, Priscilla).
July 13, 2021 FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number ANYEDC-14652718 (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 7/14/2021 (Bowens, Priscilla).
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER directing The Clerk is requested to (a) terminate all defendants in this action except Quality Med Equip Inc., Anzhelika Dzhurayeva, John Does 1 through 5, and ABC Corporations 1 through 5; (b) open separate index numbers for each of the group of plaintiffs and defendants listed as Groups 2 through 26 in the Group A Schedule annexed to plaintiffs' response (the new cases) ; (c) file this Order as the initial filing in each of the new cases; and (d) have each new case randomly assigned to a District Judge and Magistrate Judge. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Schedeule A) (Marziliano, August)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v Strac Medical LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strac Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 Through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy DeVries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Scott Marvin
Represented By: James A McKenney
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Scott Marvin
Represented By: James A McKenney
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Scott Marvin
Represented By: James A McKenney
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Daniel Scott Marvin
Represented By: James A McKenney
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?