Richardson et al v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Zellnor Y. Myrie and Diana C. Richardson
Defendant: Officer Joseph B. Taylor, Officer Solomon C. Jacobs, John Doe #1, NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea, Officer Jorge Perez, Mayor Bill de Blasio, NYPD Chief of Dept. Rodney Harrison, The City of New York, Officer Jessica Clinton and Officer Giovanni Calderon
Case Number: 1:2021cv03609
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The City of New York. (Robinson, Amy)
August 26, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Robinson on behalf of The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Robinson, Amy)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #29 is granted. Attorney Anne Devaney O'Toole is hereby terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/15/2021. (Farrell, Gillian)
August 13, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Zellnor Y. Myrie and Diana C. Richardson by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson. (O'Toole, Anne)
July 23, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson. Jorge Perez served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Hecker, Sean)
July 23, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson. Solomon C. Jacobs served on 7/21/2021, answer due 8/11/2021. (Hecker, Sean)
July 23, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson. Giovanni Calderon served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Hecker, Sean)
July 23, 2021 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson. Jessica Clinton served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Hecker, Sean)
July 23, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson. Joseph B. Taylor served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Hecker, Sean)
July 23, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson. Rodney Harrison served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. (Hecker, Sean)
July 23, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson. Dermot Shea served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Hecker, Sean)
July 23, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson. Bill de Blasio served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (Hecker, Sean)
July 23, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson. The City of New York served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (Hecker, Sean)
June 29, 2021 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Giovanni Calderon, Jessica Clinton, Rodney Harrison, Solomon C. Jacobs, Jorge Perez, Dermot Shea, Joseph B. Taylor, The City of New York, Bill de Blasio. (Layne, Monique)
June 29, 2021 Filing 18 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson (Hecker, Sean)
June 28, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne R. Yearwood on behalf of Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson (aty to be noticed) (Yearwood, Anne)
June 28, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Devaney O'Toole on behalf of Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson (aty to be noticed) (O'Toole, Anne)
June 28, 2021 Filing 15 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 28, 2021 Filing 14 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis William Fisher on behalf of Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson (aty to be noticed) (Fisher, Louis)
June 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Adam Matz on behalf of Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson (aty to be noticed) (Matz, Joshua)
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Hecker on behalf of Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson (notification declined or already on case) (Hecker, Sean)
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Summons as to Officer Jorge Perez. Re #1 Complaint, by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson. (Hecker, Sean) (Modified.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons as to Officer Solomon C. Jacobs. Re #1 Complaint, by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson. (Hecker, Sean) (Modified.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons as to Officer Giovanni Calderon. Re #1 Complaint, by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson (Hecker, Sean) (Modified.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons as to Officer Jessica Clinton. Re #1 Complaint, by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson (Hecker, Sean) (Modified.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons as to Officer Joseph B. Taylor. Re #1 Complaint, by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson (Hecker, Sean) (Modified.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons as to NYPD Chief of Department Rodney Harrison. Re: #1 Complaint, by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson (Hecker, Sean) (Modified.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons as to NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea. Re #1 Complaint, by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson (Hecker, Sean) (Modified.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons as to Mayor Bill de Blasio. Re #1 Complaint, by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson (Hecker, Sean) (Modified.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons as to the City of New York, Re #1 Complaint, by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson (Hecker, Sean) (Modified)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Giovanni Calderon, Jessica Clinton, John Doe #1, Rodney Harrison, Solomon C. Jacobs, Jorge Perez, Dermot Shea, Joseph B. Taylor, The City of New York, Bill de Blasio filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNYEDC-14602815 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Zellnor Y. Myrie, Diana C. Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Hecker, Sean)
June 28, 2021 Your proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: If multiple defendants, there must be a Rider with a list of all names and addresses of defendants attached to the summons. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 28, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson et al v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Joseph B. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Solomon C. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jorge Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill de Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Chief of Dept. Rodney Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Amy Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jessica Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Giovanni Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zellnor Y. Myrie
Represented By: Anne Devaney O'Toole
Represented By: Louis William Fisher
Represented By: Joshua Adam Matz
Represented By: Sean Hecker
Represented By: Anne R. Yearwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana C. Richardson
Represented By: Anne Devaney O'Toole
Represented By: Louis William Fisher
Represented By: Joshua Adam Matz
Represented By: Sean Hecker
Represented By: Anne R. Yearwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?