Addison v. Dharia et al
Plaintiff: Willie Addison
Defendant: D.P.M. Sumit S. Dharia, D.P.M. Bryan Makower, The Brooklyn Hospital Center, DNP FNP Yunique Desire Brisard, Bedford Stuyvesant Family Health Center and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv03959
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Remaining dfts' remanded to State Court, Kings County. (Guzzi, Roseann)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL AND REMAND: The United States of America has been substituted as a party-defendant in place of defendants Brisard and Bedford Stuyvesant; Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), the above-captioned action shall be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice against defendants Brisard and Bedford Stuyvesant. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), the above-captioned action shall be and hereby is dismissed without prejudice as against the United States of America, and such dismissal is without costs, expenses, fees or disbursement to any party as against the others. Party Bedford Stuyvesant Family Health Center and Yunique Desire Brisard terminated. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/22/2021 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Harrison on behalf of Bryan Makower (aty to be noticed) (Harrison, Andrew)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal , Amendment of Caption and Remand by Bedford Stuyvesant Family Health Center, Yunique Desire Brisard (Volpe, Christopher)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 8/4/2021 at 9:30 AM. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 3959#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements, including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Plaintiff must deliver all authorizations and medical releases to defendant at least seven (7) days prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/14/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 14, 2021 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Bedford Stuyvesant Family Health Center, Yunique Desire Brisard (Volpe, Christopher)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bedford Stuyvesant Family Health Center, Yunique Desire Brisard (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (The Brooklyn Hospital Center Answer), #3 Exhibit C (Dharia Answer), #4 Exhibit D (Brisard Answer), #5 Exhibit E (Bedford Stuyvesant Family Health Center Answer), #6 Exhibit F (Decl. of Meredith Torres), #7 Exhibit G (Declarations of Dr. Ozo-Onyali and Yunique Brisard), #8 Exhibit H (Certification of Scope of Employment)) (Volpe, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison v. Dharia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Addison
Represented By: Marla Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.P.M. Sumit S. Dharia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.P.M. Bryan Makower
Represented By: Andrew Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Brooklyn Hospital Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNP FNP Yunique Desire Brisard
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Volpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedford Stuyvesant Family Health Center
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Volpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?