Tanner v. Arizona Beverage Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Thomas L. Tanner, Jr.
Defendant: Arizona Beverage Company LLC, Arizona Beverage USA LLC, AZ Metro Distributors LLC, Arizona Iced Tea, LLC, Ali Alaheri and Glenn Marchese
Case Number: 1:2021cv04093
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for October 27, 2021 at 3:00 p.m., before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge at (888) 684-8852; Access Code #: 6223489. All counsel must be available. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conferenceOrdered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 IC QUESTIONNAIRE, #2 INDIVIDUAL RULES) (Marino, Janine)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Thomas L. Tanner, Jr. AZ Metro Distributors LLC waiver sent on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021; Ali Alaheri waiver sent on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021; Arizona Beverage Company LLC waiver sent on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021; Arizona Beverage USA LLC waiver sent on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021; Arizona Iced Tea, LLC waiver sent on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021; Glenn Marchese waiver sent on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Calliste, Gregory)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Yusha D. Hiraman on behalf of Thomas L. Tanner, Jr (aty to be noticed) (Hiraman, Yusha)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AZ Metro Distributors LLC, Ali Alaheri(In His Individual Capacity), Ali Alaheri(In His Official Capacity), Arizona Beverage Company LLC, Arizona Beverage USA LLC, Arizona Iced Tea, LLC, Glenn Marchese(In His Official Capacity), Glenn Marchese(In His Individual Capacity) filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14677724 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Thomas L. Tanner, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit B - Notice Letter, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Calliste, Gregory)
July 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanner v. Arizona Beverage Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L. Tanner, Jr.
Represented By: Yusha D. Hiraman
Represented By: Gregory Calliste, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Beverage Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Beverage USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AZ Metro Distributors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Iced Tea, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Alaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Marchese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?