Krohberger v. Long Island Railroad et al
Plaintiff: Fred Krohberger
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Cross Claimant: Long Island Railroad and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Cross Defendant: Railroad Construction Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04153
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James R Cho
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Railroad Construction Company, Inc.. (Shapiro, Scott)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 : Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Railroad Construction Company, Inc. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 10/25/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 9/20/2021. (Grieff, Robin)
September 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Cook Lander on behalf of Long Island Railroad, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Lander, Meredith)
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Pearce Mevorach on behalf of Railroad Construction Company, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Mevorach, Daniel)
August 26, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Krohberger. Long Island Railroad served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Sokoloff, Mark)
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Krohberger. National Railroad Passenger Corporation served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Sokoloff, Mark)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Krohberger. Railroad Construction Company, Inc. served on 7/28/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Sokoloff, Mark)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Railroad Construction Company, Inc. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 9/22/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 8/26/2021. (Gillespie, Saudia)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Railroad Construction Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shapiro, Scott)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michael Shapiro on behalf of Railroad Construction Company, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Shapiro, Scott)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic-Initial Conference will be held at 11:30 a.m. on 10/29/2021 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than 10/27/2021. Each party is directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 1065334. The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 8/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Railroad Construction Company, Inc. by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Fineman, Beck)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Railroad Construction Company, Inc. by Long Island Railroad. (Fineman, Beck)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Beck S. Fineman on behalf of Long Island Railroad, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Fineman, Beck)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Amtrak summons, #2 Rail Construction summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14687425 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by FRED KROHBERGER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons LIRR, #3 Proposed Summons AMTRAK, #4 Proposed Summons RCC, INC.) (Sokoloff, Mark)
July 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krohberger v. Long Island Railroad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Krohberger
Represented By: Mark G. Sokoloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Long Island Railroad
Represented By: Beck S. Fineman
Represented By: Meredith Cook Lander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Beck S. Fineman
Represented By: Meredith Cook Lander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Beck S. Fineman
Represented By: Meredith Cook Lander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Railroad Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?